EP0438096 - Stabilizers for ethylene/chlorotrifluoroethylene copolymer compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/30] | Stabilizers for halopolymer compositions | ||
[1995/34] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.1996 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.08.1996 [1996/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUSIMONT U.S.A. Inc. 44 Whippany Road Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/30] | For all designated states AUSIMONT U.S.A. Inc. 44 Whippany Road Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Chii-Shu 151, Harrison Road USA-Parsippany, N.J. 07054 / US | [1991/30] | Representative(s) | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/30] | LOUIS, PÖHLAU, LOHRENTZ & SEGETH Postfach 3055 D-90014 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 91100355.6 | 12.01.1991 | [1991/30] | Priority number, date | US19900464973 | 16.01.1990 Original published format: US 464973 | [1991/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0438096 | Date: | 24.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0438096 | Date: | 23.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/3477, C08K5/00, C08L23/08, C08L27/12, // (C08K5/00, 5:3477, 5:37, 5:526) | [1991/30] | CPC: |
C08K5/3477 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/3477, C08L23/08 (EP);
C08K5/3477, C08L27/12 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/30] | Title | German: | Stabilisatoren für Zusammensetzungen von Ethylen/Chlorotri- fluoroethylen Copolymeren | [1995/34] | English: | Stabilizers for ethylene/chlorotrifluoroethylene copolymer compositions | [1995/34] | French: | Stabilisants pour compositions de copolymère éthlène/chlorotrifluoroéthylène | [1995/34] |
Former [1991/30] | Stabilisatoren für Zusammensetzungen von halogenhaltigen Polymeren | ||
Former [1991/30] | Stabilizers for halopolymer compositions | ||
Former [1991/30] | Stabilisants pour compositions de halopolymères | Examination procedure | 22.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/13] | 29.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 20.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 23.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2127760 (CIBA GEIGY AG); | [Y]EP0330256 (ENICHEM SINTESI [IT]) |