EP0438101 - Use of water-resistant formaldehyde-free corrugating adhesive compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/30] | Water-resistant formaldehyde-free corrugating adhesive compositions | ||
[1995/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.07.1996 [1996/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Starch and Chemical Investment Holding Corporation 501 Silverside Road Wilmington, Delaware 19809 / US | [1991/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Foran, Michael 985 Robin Road Somerville, New Jersey 08876 / US | 02 /
Schoenberg, Jules 2079 Lyde Place Scotch Plains, New Jersey 07076 / US | 03 /
Ray-Chaudhuri, Dilip 484 Rolling Hill Road Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | [1991/30] | Representative(s) | Hagemann, Heinrich, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/30] | Hagemann, Heinrich, Dr. rer. nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte Hagemann & Kehl Postfach 86 03 29 D-81630 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91100375.4 | 14.01.1991 | [1991/30] | Priority number, date | US19900467601 | 19.01.1990 Original published format: US 467601 | [1991/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0438101 | Date: | 24.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0438101 | Date: | 05.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0438101 | Date: | 26.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C09J103/02 | [1991/30] | CPC: |
C09J103/02 (EP,US);
C08L2666/14 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C09J103/02, C08L2666/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1991/30] | Title | German: | Verwendung einer wasserfesten formaldehydfreien Wellpappenklebstoffmasse | [1995/30] | English: | Use of water-resistant formaldehyde-free corrugating adhesive compositions | [1995/30] | French: | Utilisation d'une composition de colle ne dégageant pas de formaldéhyde, résistant à l'eau et destinée à la fabrication de carton ondulé | [1995/30] |
Former [1991/30] | Wasserfeste formaldehydfreie Wellpappenklebstoffmasse | ||
Former [1991/30] | Water-resistant formaldehyde-free corrugating adhesive compositions | ||
Former [1991/30] | Composition de colle ne dégageant pas de formaldéhyde, résistant à l'eau et destinée à la fabrication de carton ondulé | Examination procedure | 24.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/13] | 01.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP51106138 ; | [Y]US3607331 (STROTHER GREENE W, et al); | [A]US3737370 (JAROWENKO W, et al); | [A]US4029885 (BUIKEMA PETER D) | [Y] - WORLD PATENTS INDEX Week 7646, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 76-85584X & JP-A-51 106 138 (HOHNEN OIL KK) 21 September 1976, & JP51106138 A 19760921 | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 76, no. 1, 3 January 1972, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 5130W, MIYOSHI ATSUO ET AL.: 'MANUFACTURING RESINS FROM STARCHES AND PLANT GUMS' page 77 ; |