EP0444407 - High speed decoding circuit with improved and gate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.1996 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.09.1996 [1996/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/36] | For all designated states INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION Armonk, NY 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chappell, Barbara A. RFD Adele Court Amawalk, N.Y. 10501 / US | 02 /
Chappell, Terry I. RFD Adele Court Amawalk, N.Y. 10501 / US | 03 /
Schuster, Stanley E. Richard Somers Road Granite Springs N.Y. 10527 / US | [1991/36] | Representative(s) | Schäfer, Wolfgang IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht 70548 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/38] | Schäfer, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1993/19] | Klocke, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht Pascalstrasse 100 D-70569 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1993/12] | Klocke, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Elmar Ott, Dipl.-Ing. Peter Klocke, Dipl.-Phys. Hans-J. Neubauer, Kappelstrasse 8 D-72160 Horb / DE | ||
Former [1991/36] | Gaugel, Heinz, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland GmbH Schönaicher Strasse 220 D-7030 Böblingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 91100536.1 | 18.01.1991 | [1991/36] | Priority number, date | US19900488358 | 02.03.1990 Original published format: US 488358 | [1991/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0444407 | Date: | 04.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0444407 | Date: | 06.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H03K19/0948, G11C8/00 | [1991/36] | CPC: |
G11C8/10 (EP,US);
H03K19/0948 (EP,US);
H03M7/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/36] | Title | German: | Dekodierungsschaltung hoher Schaltgeschwindigkeit mit verbessertem UND-Gatter | [1991/36] | English: | High speed decoding circuit with improved and gate | [1991/36] | French: | Circuit de décodage à vitesse de commutation élevée et à porte logique ET améliorée | [1991/36] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 19.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/09] | 19.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.07.1996 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1996/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1996 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP63294125 ; | [A]JP62298226 ; | [AP]JP2190810 ; | [A]US4710649 (LEWIS EDWARD T [US]); | [A]US4845677 (CHAPPELL BARBARA A [US], et al); | [A]US4893031 (MASUDA EIJI [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 126 (E-734)(3474), 28 March 1989; & JP - A - 63294125 (HITACHI LTD.) 30.11.1988, & JP63294125 A 19890328 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 196 (E-618)(3043), 7 June 1988; & JP - A - 62298226 (SATORU KIN) 25.12.1987, & JP62298226 A 19880607 | [AP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 288 (E-943)(4231), 21 June 1990; & JP - A - 2190810 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP.) 30.03.1990, & JP2190810 A 19900621 |