EP0438170 - Plastic optical fibers and process for the production thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.06.1995 [1995/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI RAYON CO., LTD. 3-19, Kyobashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8350 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/30] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI RAYON CO., LTD. 3-19, Kyobashi 2-chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo 104 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamoto, Takashi, Central Research Laboratories Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd., 20-1 Miyuki-cho Ohtake-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | 02 /
Matsumoto, Tsuruyoshi, Central Research Lab. Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd., 20-1 Miyuki-cho Ohtake-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | 03 /
Shimada, Katsuhiko, Central Research Laboratories Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd., 20-1 Miyuki-cho Ohtake-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | [1991/30] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/30] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91100584.1 | 18.01.1991 | [1991/30] | Priority number, date | JP19900008126 | 19.01.1990 Original published format: JP 812690 | JP19900312931 | 20.11.1990 Original published format: JP 31293190 | [1991/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0438170 | Date: | 24.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0438170 | Date: | 02.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G02B1/04, G02B6/16 | [1991/30] | CPC: |
G02B6/02033 (EP,US);
G02B6/00 (KR);
G02B1/046 (EP,US);
G02B1/048 (EP,US);
B29C48/00 (EP,US);
B29C48/05 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
G02B1/046, C08L33/16 (EP,US);
G02B1/048, C08L45/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1991/30] | Title | German: | Optische Kunstharzfaser und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [1991/30] | English: | Plastic optical fibers and process for the production thereof | [1991/30] | French: | Fibres optiques en matière synthétique et procédé pour leur fabrication | [1991/30] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 28.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/26] | 08.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/24] | 19.01.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1995 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4530569 (SQUIRE EDWARD N [US]); | [X]WO8912240 (DU PONT [US]); | [A]WO8912071 (DU PONT [US]); | [X]EP0349126 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]) |