EP0496014 - Stiff tubular structure boat [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.1995 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scanu, Luciano 63, Via Oristano I-09094 Marrubiu (Oristano) / IT | [1992/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/31] | Representative(s) | Sassatelli, Franco Ufficio Internazionale Brevetti INIP 125, via Mazzini 40137 Bologna / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/31] | Sassatelli, Franco T., Dr. c/o INIP 5, via Ruggi I-40137 Bologna / IT | Application number, filing date | 91100735.9 | 22.01.1991 | [1992/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0496014 | Date: | 29.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0496014 | Date: | 30.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B63B1/02, B63B35/73 | [1992/31] | CPC: |
B63B1/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/31] | Title | German: | Boot mit starrer Rohrstruktur | [1992/31] | English: | Stiff tubular structure boat | [1992/31] | French: | Bateau à structure tubulaire rigide | [1992/31] | Examination procedure | 26.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/53] | 06.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.01.1995 | [2000/06] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE444175 (ALOIS STREICHER); | [Y]US3724011 (SCHOLLE R); | [A]FR2561196 (LLOBREGA FREDERIQUE [FR]) |