EP0450271 - Armour jointing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.1997 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.03.1997 [1997/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL STK A/S Box 60 Okern N-0508 Oslo 5 / NO | [1991/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roald, Ove Elias Eikskollen 4 N-1440 Drobak / NO | 02 /
Pettersen, Bjorn Jotunveien 15B N-1185 Oslo 11 / NO | [1991/41] | Representative(s) | Pohl, Herbert, et al Alcatel Alsthom, Intellectual Property Department, P.O. Box 30 09 29 70449 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/41] | Pohl, Herbert, Dipl.-Ing, et al Alcatel SEL AG Patent- und Lizenzwesen Postfach 30 09 29 D-70449 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 91100886.0 | 24.01.1991 | [1991/41] | Priority number, date | NO19900001471 | 30.03.1990 Original published format: NO 901471 | [1991/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0450271 | Date: | 09.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0450271 | Date: | 05.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0450271 | Date: | 03.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01R9/05, H02G15/14 | [1992/32] | CPC: |
H01R9/0503 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1991/41] | H01R9/05 | Designated contracting states | FR, IT, SE [1991/41] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Verbinden von Bewehrungsdrähten | [1991/41] | English: | Armour jointing method | [1991/41] | French: | Procédé de jonctionnement d'armure | [1991/41] | Examination procedure | 20.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/11] | 17.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1993 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE465409 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]US3701080 (BAISZ GEORGE J, et al); | [A]EP0113053 (CABLES DE LYON GEOFFROY DELORE [FR]) | Examination | EP0046544 |