EP0440115 - Metallic wall structure with a core layer made from an iron/nickel base alloy and a cladding layer containing oxide-forming elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Forschungszentrum Jülich GmbH 52425 Jülich / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/32] | For all designated states FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM JÜLICH GMBH Wilhelm-Johnen-Strasse D-52425 Jülich / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ennis, Philip James Josefstrasse 11 W-5170 Jülich / DE | 02 /
Bongartz, Karl, Dr. Zum Jagdfeld 6 W-5170 Jülich / DE | 03 /
Nickel, Hubertus, Prof. Am Waldeck 5 W-5170 Jülich / DE | 04 /
Schuster, Hans, Dr. Colynshofstrasse 7 W-5100 Aachen / DE | 05 /
Quadakkers, Willem Josef Stephanusstrasse 6 W-5170 Jülich / DE | [1991/32] | Application number, filing date | 91101007.2 | 26.01.1991 | [1991/32] | Priority number, date | DE19904002839 | 01.02.1990 Original published format: DE 4002839 | [1991/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0440115 | Date: | 07.08.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0440115 | Date: | 21.09.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B32B15/01 | [1991/32] | CPC: |
B32B15/015 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE [1994/16] |
Former [1991/32] | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | Wandstruktur mit Kernschicht auf Eisen/Nickellegierungsbasis mit oxidbildender Oberflächenschicht | [1991/32] | English: | Metallic wall structure with a core layer made from an iron/nickel base alloy and a cladding layer containing oxide-forming elements | [1991/32] | French: | Structure métallique constituée d'une couche de support en un alliage à base de fer/nickel et d'un revêtement comportant un élément formateur d'une couche d'oxyde | [1991/32] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 01.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/14] | 24.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 07.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 16.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2123014 (INT NICKEL LTD); | [Y]FR2511698 (TOYO ENGINEERING CORP [JP]); | [A]FR2149294 (APV PARAMOUNT LTD); | [A]FR2347153 (JAPAN STEEL WORKS LTD [JP]); | [A]FR2067085 (VOEST AG [AT]); | [A]GB2066696 (TOYO ENGINEERING CORP) | Examination | FR2566803 |