EP0440121 - Arrangement of clamps [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.1994 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DYES GMBH BÜROMÖBELWERK Am Deisterbahnhof 6 D-31848 Bad Münder / DE | [1991/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uredat, Claus Vösseberge 18 W-4592 Lindern / DE | 02 /
Ritter, Wolfgang Feuerbacher Weg 14 W-7000 Stuttgart 1 / DE | [1991/32] | Representative(s) | Raible, Hans Schoderstrasse 10 70192 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/32] | Raible, Hans, Dipl.-Ing. Schoderstrasse 10 D-70192 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 91101034.6 | 27.01.1991 | [1991/32] | Priority number, date | DE19900000987U | 30.01.1990 Original published format: DE 9000987 U | [1991/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0440121 | Date: | 07.08.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0440121 | Date: | 28.04.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F16B12/00, B25B5/00 | [1991/32] | CPC: |
A47B13/06 (EP);
A47B19/00 (EP);
A47B21/03 (EP);
A47B23/04 (EP);
A47B2037/005 (EP);
A47B2200/0085 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1991/32] | Title | German: | Zwingenanordnung | [1991/32] | English: | Arrangement of clamps | [1991/32] | French: | Disposition de brides | [1993/17] |
Former [1991/32] | Disposition des brides | Examination procedure | 09.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/41] | 07.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE3143914 [ ] (ANGELO GIOVANNI D); | FR2635658 [ ] (NOCLIN OLIVIER [FR]); | US4089513 [ ] (MACK RAYMOND F) |