EP0448937 - Hose pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.1994 | Change - withdrawal | published on 06.07.1994 [1994/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel SEL Aktiengesellschaft Lorenzstrasse 10 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/40] | For all designated states Alcatel SEL Aktiengesellschaft Lorenzstrasse 10 D-70435 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hopfensperger, Reinhold Im Feld 9 W-8311 Dietelskirchen / DE | 02 /
Tungl, Rudolf Flurstrasse 28 W-8300 Ergolding / DE | 03 /
Rockermeier, Albert Sittelsdorf 23 W-8301 Herrngiersdorf / DE | [1991/40] | Representative(s) | Pohl, Herbert, et al Alcatel Alsthom, Intellectual Property Department, P.O. Box 30 09 29 70449 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/40] | Pohl, Herbert, Dipl.-Ing, et al Alcatel SEL AG Patent- und Lizenzwesen Postfach 30 09 29 D-70449 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 91101417.3 | 02.02.1991 | [1991/40] | Priority number, date | DE19904005725 | 23.02.1990 Original published format: DE 4005725 | DE19904031554 | 05.10.1990 Original published format: DE 4031554 | [1991/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0448937 | Date: | 02.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0448937 | Date: | 02.01.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F04B43/12, F04B9/02 | [1991/40] | CPC: |
F04B43/1238 (EP,US);
F04B9/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1991/40] | Title | German: | Schlauchpumpe | [1991/40] | English: | Hose pump | [1991/40] | French: | Pompe à tuyau flexible | [1991/40] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 20.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/30] | 22.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1994 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4271988 (CLAUSEN ANTHONY R); | [X]US2975719 (SAMUEL KAUFMAN); | [X]FR2347106 (GUBIAN ROLLAND [FR]); | [X]DE2033344 ; | [X]US2551605 (JAMES DAVID T, et al); | [Y]FR2383333 (MALBEC EDOUARD [FR]); | [Y]US4547136 (ROTHSTEIN ROBERT A [US]); | [A]DE1528964 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | [A]EP0320963 (VICENTINI RENATO) |