EP0442342 - Voice signal processing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.1995 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.11.1995 [1995/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/34] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kane, Joji 4-34, Jingu 1-chome Nara-shi, Nara 631 / JP | 02 /
Nohara, Akira 10-17, Matsuzonocho Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo 662 / JP | [1991/34] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/34] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91101452.0 | 04.02.1991 | [1991/34] | Priority number, date | JP19900033210 | 13.02.1990 Original published format: JP 3321090 | JP19900033211 | 13.02.1990 Original published format: JP 3321190 | [1991/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0442342 | Date: | 21.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0442342 | Date: | 17.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G10L3/00, G10L3/02 | [1991/34] | CPC: |
G10L25/93 (EP,US);
G10L15/02 (KR);
G10L21/0208 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1991/34] | Title | German: | Sprachsignalverarbeitungsvorrichtung | [1991/34] | English: | Voice signal processing device | [1991/34] | French: | Dispositif pour le traitement de signaux vocaux | [1991/34] | Examination procedure | 05.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/36] | 06.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3566035 (NOLL A MICHAEL, et al); | [A]US4630305 (BORTH DAVID E [US], et al); | [A]WO8807739 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) | [X] - THE JOURNAL OF THE ACOUSTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, vol. 41, no. 2, 1967, pages 293-309; A.M. NOLL: "Cepstrum pitch determination" | [Y] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONICS, CONTROL AND INSTRUMENTATION, Cambridge, MA, 3rd - 6th November 1987, pages 997-1002; R.J. CONWAY et al.: "Adaptive processing with feature extraction to enhance the intelligibility of noise-corrupted speech" | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, San Diego, CA, 19th - 21st March 1984, pages 18A.5.1-4; B.A. HANSON et al.: "The harmonic magnitude supression (BMS) technique for intelligibility enhancement in the presence of interfering speech" |