EP0444442 - CO or CO2 waveguide laser [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.05.1995 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.07.1995 [1995/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CARL ZEISS JENA GmbH Tatzendpromenade 1a 07745 Jena / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/51] | For all designated states CARL ZEISS JENA GmbH Tatzendpromenade 1a D-07745 Jena / DE | ||
Former [1991/36] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krüger, Hans, Dipl.-Phys. Peralohstrasse 13 W-8000 München 83 / DE | 02 /
Weber, Hubert, Dipl.-Phys. Bahnhofstrasse 26 W-8900 Augsburg / DE | [1991/36] | Representative(s) | Muhsfeldt, Willi Tatzendpromenade 1a 07740 Jena / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/51] | Muhsfeldt, Willi c/o Carl Zeiss Jena GmbH Zentralbereich Entwicklungsdienste Tatzendpromenade 1a D-07747 Jena / DE | Application number, filing date | 91101540.2 | 05.02.1991 | [1991/36] | Priority number, date | DE19904006460 | 01.03.1990 Original published format: DE 4006460 | [1991/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0444442 | Date: | 04.09.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0444442 | Date: | 13.11.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/038, H01S3/03 | [1991/46] | CPC: |
H01S3/0315 (EP,US);
H01S3/0388 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/36] | H01S3/03 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1991/36] | Title | German: | CO- oder CO2-Wellenleiterlaser | [1991/36] | English: | CO or CO2 waveguide laser | [1991/36] | French: | Laser à guide d'onde à CO ou à CO2 | [1991/36] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 11.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/28] | 04.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M10) | 15.12.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/28] | 13.02.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1995 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR89308 ; | [Y]US4719639 (TULIP JOHN [CA]); | [Y]EP0267304 (LITEF GMBH [DE]) | [YD] - IEEE JOURNAL OF QUANTUM ELECTRONICS, Band QE-20, Nr. 3, März 1984, Seiten 182-185; S. LOVOLD et al.: "Continuously tunable high-pressure RF-excited CO2 waveguide laser" | [Y] - THIN SOLID FILMS, Band 63, Nr. 1, Oktober 1979, Seiten 119-120; I.E. KANTER et al.: "Surface metallization studies for excimer laser electrodes" |