EP0446610 - Magnified phased array with a digital beamforming network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.11.1992 [1992/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O. Box 45066 Los Angeles, California 90045-0066 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/27] | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O. Box 45066 Los Angeles, California 90045-0066 / US | ||
Former [1991/38] | For all designated states HUGHES AIRCRAFT COMPANY P.O. Box 80028 Los Angeles, CA 90080-0028 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chang, Donald C. D. 3142 Montagne Way Thousand Oaks, CA 91362 / US | 02 /
Von der Embse, Urban A. 7323 W. 85th Street Los Angeles, CA 90045 / US | [1991/38] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/38] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91101693.9 | 07.02.1991 | [1991/38] | Priority number, date | US19900490028 | 07.03.1990 Original published format: US 490028 | [1991/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0446610 | Date: | 18.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q3/26 | [1991/38] | CPC: |
H01Q25/008 (EP);
H01Q3/2658 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1991/38] | Title | German: | Vergrösserte phasengesteuerte Gruppenantenne mit digitalem Strahlformungsnetzwerk | [1991/38] | English: | Magnified phased array with a digital beamforming network | [1991/38] | French: | Antenne à balayage électronique à grossissement avec un réseau numérique de formation de faisceaux | [1991/38] | File destroyed: | 16.02.2000 | Examination procedure | 19.03.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/47] | 23.06.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1992/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2130798 ; | [Y]FR2588422 ; | [A]EP0109322 ; | [A]EP0276817 |