EP0446616 - Process for inhibiting corrosion in oil production fluids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.1995 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCANDINAVIAN OILFIELD CHEMICALS AS Lars Hillesg. 20 B 5000 Bergen / NO | [N/P] |
Former [1991/38] | For all designated states SCANDINAVIAN OILFIELD CHEMICALS AS Lars Hillesg. 20 B N-5000 Bergen / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Larsen, Arthur Lee Ovre Kalfarlien 6 N-5018 Bergen / NO | [1991/38] | Representative(s) | Säger, Manfred Säger & Hofmann Patent AG Feldgüetliweg 130 8706 Meilen (ZH) / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Säger, Manfred Säger & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei (GbR) Römersteig 2 Postfach 5 7304 Maienfeld / CH | ||
Former [1994/06] | Säger, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Säger & Partner Postfach 81 08 09 D-81908 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/38] | Säger, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Säger & Partner Postfach 81 08 09 D-81908 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91101772.1 | 08.02.1991 | [1991/38] | Priority number, date | DE19904003893 | 09.02.1990 Original published format: DE 4003893 | [1991/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0446616 | Date: | 18.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0446616 | Date: | 07.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | E21B41/02, // C23F11/14 | [1991/38] | CPC: |
C23F11/145 (EP,US);
C09K8/54 (EP,US);
C23F11/144 (EP,US);
Y10S166/902 (EP,US);
Y10S507/939 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/38] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Korrosionshemmung in Erdölförderflüssigkeiten | [1991/38] | English: | Process for inhibiting corrosion in oil production fluids | [1991/38] | French: | Procédé d'inhibition de corrosion dans des fluides de récupération d'huile | [1991/38] | Examination procedure | 29.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/14] | 21.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1994 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   19.05.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.12.1994 | BE | 07.12.1994 | CH | 07.12.1994 | DK | 07.12.1994 | ES | 07.12.1994 | GR | 07.12.1994 | IT | 07.12.1994 | LI | 07.12.1994 | LU | 28.02.1995 | SE | 07.03.1995 | [2008/02] |
Former [2002/25] | AT | 07.12.1994 | |
BE | 07.12.1994 | ||
CH | 07.12.1994 | ||
DK | 07.12.1994 | ||
ES | 07.12.1994 | ||
GR | 07.12.1994 | ||
IT | 07.12.1994 | ||
LI | 07.12.1994 | ||
LU | 28.02.1995 | ||
SE | 07.03.1995 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 07.12.1994 | |
BE | 07.12.1994 | ||
CH | 07.12.1994 | ||
DK | 07.12.1994 | ||
GR | 07.12.1994 | ||
IT | 07.12.1994 | ||
LI | 07.12.1994 | ||
LU | 28.02.1995 | ||
SE | 07.03.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 07.12.1994 | |
BE | 07.12.1994 | ||
CH | 07.12.1994 | ||
DK | 07.12.1994 | ||
IT | 07.12.1994 | ||
LI | 07.12.1994 | ||
SE | 07.03.1995 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 07.12.1994 | |
BE | 07.12.1994 | ||
CH | 07.12.1994 | ||
DK | 07.12.1994 | ||
LI | 07.12.1994 | ||
SE | 07.03.1995 | ||
Former [1995/42] | AT | 07.12.1994 | |
BE | 07.12.1994 | ||
CH | 07.12.1994 | ||
LI | 07.12.1994 | ||
SE | 07.03.1995 | ||
Former [1995/40] | AT | 07.12.1994 | |
CH | 07.12.1994 | ||
LI | 07.12.1994 | ||
Former [1995/31] | CH | 07.12.1994 | |
LI | 07.12.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3054750 (JOLLY SAMUEL E); | [A]FR1451354 (PROD CHIM D AUBY SOC D); | [A]GB1062359 (ARMOUR & CO); | [A]US4201678 (FISCHER PAUL W [US], et al); | [A]DD234897 (GOMMERN ERDOEL ERDGAS [DD]) |