EP0498019 - Protective contact terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.04.1996 [1996/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/33] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krec, Zdenek, Ing. Berliner Strasse 22 D-93057 Regensburg / DE | [1995/16] |
Former [1992/33] | 01 /
Krec, Zdenek, Ing. Berliner Strasse 22 W-8400 Regensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 91101792.9 | 08.02.1991 | [1992/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0498019 | Date: | 12.08.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0498019 | Date: | 19.04.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01R9/26 | [1992/33] | CPC: |
H01R9/2691 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI [1992/33] | Title | German: | Schutzleiteranschlussklemme | [1992/33] | English: | Protective contact terminal | [1992/33] | French: | Borne à fil de protection | [1992/33] | Examination procedure | 22.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/12] | 06.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2615134 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]DE2934317 (WOERTZ FA); | [AD]DE2841302 (WIELAND ELEKTRISCHE INDUSTRIE); | [A]DE2914182 (WIELAND ELEKTRISCHE INDUSTRIE) |