EP0453718 - Shaving head, in particular the razor blade unit of a mechanical razor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.1995 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wilkinson Sword Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Schützenstrasse 110 42659 Solingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/44] | For all designated states Wilkinson Sword Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Schützenstrasse 110 D-42659 Solingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Althaus, Wolfgang Hülsberg 94 W-5600 Wuppertal 12 / DE | [1991/44] | Representative(s) | Brinkmann & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/44] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70 D-40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 91101820.8 | 09.02.1991 | [1991/44] | Priority number, date | DE19900004762U | 27.04.1990 Original published format: DE 9004762 U | [1991/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0453718 | Date: | 30.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0453718 | Date: | 09.11.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B26B21/22, B26B21/54 | [1991/44] | CPC: |
B26B21/4006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/44] | Title | German: | Rasierapparatekopf, insbesondere Rasierklingeneinheit, eines Nassrasierapparates | [1991/44] | English: | Shaving head, in particular the razor blade unit of a mechanical razor | [1991/44] | French: | Tête de rasage, particulièrement une unité de lames pour rasoir mécanique | [1991/44] | Examination procedure | 30.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/14] | 26.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.02.1995 | DK | 09.02.1995 | SE | 10.02.1995 | BE | 28.02.1995 | CH | 28.02.1995 | LI | 28.02.1995 | LU | 28.02.1995 | [2000/06] |
Former [1996/28] | AT | 09.02.1995 | |
DK | 09.02.1995 | ||
SE | 10.02.1995 | ||
BE | 28.02.1995 | ||
CH | 28.02.1995 | ||
LI | 28.02.1995 | ||
Former [1996/16] | DK | 09.02.1995 | |
SE | 10.02.1995 | ||
BE | 28.02.1995 | ||
CH | 28.02.1995 | ||
LI | 28.02.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | SE | 10.02.1995 | |
BE | 28.02.1995 | ||
CH | 28.02.1995 | ||
LI | 28.02.1995 | ||
Former [1996/02] | CH | 28.02.1995 | |
LI | 28.02.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4084316 (FRANCIS JOHN FREDERICK); | [X]GB2110975 (GILLETTE CO); | [X]GB2171630 (AMERICA ISRAEL BLADES LIMITED); | [Y]US4875287 (CREASY WALTER S [US], et al); | [Y]EP0357821 | Examination | GB2009017 | DE8711506U |