EP0442407 - Ferromagnetic thin film magnetic field sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.02.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.1994 | Change - applicant | published on 31.08.1994 [1994/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Forschungszentrum Jülich GmbH 52425 Jülich / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | For all designated states FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM JÜLICH GMBH Wilhelm-Johnen-Strasse D-52425 Jülich / DE | ||
Former [1991/34] | For all designated states Forschungszentrum Jülich GmbH Wilhelm-Johnen-Strasse D-52425 Jülich / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grünberg, Peter, Dr. Einsteinstrasse 34 W-5170 Jülich / DE | 02 /
Schreiber, Reinert Heinrichsallee 1 W-5180 Eschweiler / DE | 03 /
Vohl, Michael Bahlenstrasse 181 W-4000 Düsseldorf 13 / DE | [1991/34] | Application number, filing date | 91101857.0 | 11.02.1991 | [1991/34] | Priority number, date | DE19904004304 | 13.02.1990 Original published format: DE 4004304 | DE19904027226 | 29.08.1990 Original published format: DE 4027226 | [1991/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0442407 | Date: | 21.08.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01F10/14 | [1991/34] | CPC: |
B82Y25/00 (EP);
G01R33/093 (EP);
G11B5/3903 (EP);
H01F10/32 (EP);
H10N50/85 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/34] | Title | German: | Magnetfeldsensor mit ferromagnetischer, dünner Schicht | [1991/34] | English: | Ferromagnetic thin film magnetic field sensor | [1991/34] | French: | Détecteur de champ magnétique avec film mince ferro-magnétique | [1991/34] | File destroyed: | 28.02.2000 | Examination procedure | 21.02.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/16] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JPS6184572 [ ] (TDK CORP); | DE3810244 [ ] (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | JPS63288411 [ ] (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | DE3820475 [ ] |