EP0442490 - Method for producing single crystal boron nitride film [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/34] | Method for producing boron nitride film | ||
[1995/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.04.1996 [1996/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/34] | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kimoto, Tunenobu, c/o Itami Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd., 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Tomikawa Tadashi, c/o Itami Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd., 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 03 /
Fujita, Nobuhiko, c/o Itami Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd., 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [1991/34] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/34] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91102090.7 | 14.02.1991 | [1991/34] | Priority number, date | JP19900032973 | 14.02.1990 Original published format: JP 3297390 | [1991/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0442490 | Date: | 21.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0442490 | Date: | 03.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C30B25/02, C23C16/34, C30B29/38, C30B29/40 | [1991/34] | CPC: |
C30B29/403 (EP);
C23C16/342 (EP);
C23C16/45531 (EP);
C23C16/45542 (EP);
C30B25/02 (EP);
C30B25/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/34] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer einkristallinen Bornitridschicht | [1995/18] | English: | Method for producing single crystal boron nitride film | [1995/18] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de film nitrure de bore monocristallin | [1995/18] |
Former [1991/34] | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Bornitridschicht | ||
Former [1991/34] | Method for producing boron nitride film | ||
Former [1991/34] | Procédé de fabrication de film nitrure de bore | Examination procedure | 10.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/06] | 02.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 05.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP63239197 ; | [A]JP62260062 ; | [A]JP6369973 ; | [A]US3561920 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 42 (C-564)(3390) 30 January 1989, & JP-A-63 239197 (YUKIO OSAKA) 05 October 1988,, & JP63239197 A 19881005 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 143 (C-492)(2990) 30 April 1988, & JP-A-62 260062 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC IND LTD) 12 November 1987,, & JP62260062 A 19871112 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 299 (C-520)(3146) 15 August 1988, & JP-A-63 69973 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC IND LTD) 30 March 1988,, & JP6369973 A 19880330 | [A] - JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH. vol. 99, no. 1/4, January 1990, AMSTERDAM NL pages 346 - 351; N. OHTSUKA ET AL: "A NEW GaAs ON Si STRUCTURE USING AlAs BUFFER LAYERS GROWN BY ATOMIC LAYER EPITAXY" | [A] - JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH. vol. 98, no. 1/2, November 1989, AMSTERDAM NL pages 195 - 208; S.P. DenBAARS ET AL: "ATOMIC LAYER EPITAXY OF COMPOUND SEMICONDUCTORS WITH METALORGANIC PRECURSORS" | [AD] - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS. vol. 53, no. 11, 12 September 1988, NEW YORK US pages 962 - 964; O. MISHIMA ET AL: "Ultraviolet light-emitting diode of a cubic boron nitride pn junction made at high pressure" |