EP0442502 - Disk cartridge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.1997 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.05.1997 [1997/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAI NIPPON INSATSU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Ichigaya-Kagacho 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo-To / JP | [1991/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Akiyama, Noboru, c/o Dai Nippon Insatsu K.K. 1-1, Ichigaya-kagacho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo-to / JP | 02 /
Kameda, Katsumi, c/o Dai Nippon Insatsu K.K. 1-1, Ichigaya-kagacho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo-to / JP | [1991/34] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/34] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91102110.3 | 14.02.1991 | [1991/34] | Priority number, date | JP19900013181U | 14.02.1990 Original published format: JP 1318190 U | JP19900015465U | 19.02.1990 Original published format: JP 1546590 U | JP19900018575U | 26.02.1990 Original published format: JP 1857590 U | JP19900026509U | 15.03.1990 Original published format: JP 2650990 U | JP19900026510U | 15.03.1990 Original published format: JP 2651090 U | JP19900032587U | 28.03.1990 Original published format: JP 3258790 U | JP19900040851U | 17.04.1990 Original published format: JP 4085190 U | JP19900040853U | 17.04.1990 Original published format: JP 4085390 U | JP19900040854U | 17.04.1990 Original published format: JP 4085490 U | JP19900040855U | 17.04.1990 Original published format: JP 4085590 U | JP19900040856U | 17.04.1990 Original published format: JP 4085690 U | JP19900040857U | 17.04.1990 Original published format: JP 4085790 U | JP19900040858U | 17.04.1990 Original published format: JP 4085890 U | JP19900040859U | 17.04.1990 Original published format: JP 4085990 U | JP19900040860U | 17.04.1990 Original published format: JP 4086090 U | JP19900040861U | 17.04.1990 Original published format: JP 4086190 U | [1991/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0442502 | Date: | 21.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0442502 | Date: | 11.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0442502 | Date: | 05.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G11B23/03 | [1991/34] | CPC: |
G11B23/0303 (EP,US);
G11B23/03 (KR);
G11B23/0307 (EP,US);
G11B23/0308 (EP,US);
G11B23/0316 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1991/34] | Title | German: | Plattenkassette | [1991/34] | English: | Disk cartridge | [1991/34] | French: | Cassette à disques | [1991/34] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1996/18: Teilanmeldung 95114967.3, 95114971.5, 95114972.3 | EPB 1996/18: Divisional applications 95114967.3, 95114971.5, 95114972.3 | EPB 1996/18: Demandes Divisionnaires 95114967.3, 95114971.5, 95114972.3 | Examination procedure | 25.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/43] | 14.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP95114967.3 / EP0690443 | EP95114971.5 / EP0690444 | EP95114972.3 / EP0691650 | Opposition(s) | 06.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2508220 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [X]EP0137965 (HITACHI MAXELL [JP], et al); | [A]EP0160538 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [A]EP0206897 (SHAPE INC [US]); | [X]EP0218231 (HITACHI MAXELL [JP]); | [X]EP0244132 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [X]EP0255185 (OPTICAL STORAGE INT [NL]); | [A]EP0266781 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [A]EP0336637 (HITACHI MAXELL [JP]); | [X]EP0343844 (SONY CORP [JP]) | by applicant | EP0244132 | EP0255185 |