EP0442510 - Method and apparatus for ultrasonic liquid atomization [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/34] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rüttel, Martin St.-Marienstrasse 16 W-8621 Grub a. Forst / DE | [1991/34] | Application number, filing date | 91102120.2 | 14.02.1991 | [1991/34] | Priority number, date | DE19904004541 | 14.02.1990 Original published format: DE 4004541 | [1991/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0442510 | Date: | 21.08.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0442510 | Date: | 25.01.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B06B1/02 | [1991/34] | CPC: |
B06B1/0253 (EP);
B06B2201/77 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/34] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung für die Ultraschall-Flüssigkeits-Zerstäubung | [1991/34] | English: | Method and apparatus for ultrasonic liquid atomization | [1991/34] | French: | Méthode et installation pour atomisation ultrasonique d'un liquide | [1991/34] | Examination procedure | 17.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/46] | 27.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 25.01.1995 | ES | 25.01.1995 | FR | 25.01.1995 | GB | 25.01.1995 | GR | 25.01.1995 | IT | 25.01.1995 | NL | 25.01.1995 | AT | 14.02.1995 | CH | 28.02.1995 | LI | 28.02.1995 | LU | 28.02.1995 | SE | 25.04.1995 | [2004/35] |
Former [2002/25] | BE | 25.01.1995 | |
ES | 25.01.1995 | ||
GB | 25.01.1995 | ||
GR | 25.01.1995 | ||
IT | 25.01.1995 | ||
NL | 25.01.1995 | ||
AT | 14.02.1995 | ||
CH | 28.02.1995 | ||
LI | 28.02.1995 | ||
LU | 28.02.1995 | ||
SE | 25.04.1995 | ||
FR | 23.06.1995 | ||
Former [2000/05] | BE | 25.01.1995 | |
GB | 25.01.1995 | ||
GR | 25.01.1995 | ||
IT | 25.01.1995 | ||
NL | 25.01.1995 | ||
AT | 14.02.1995 | ||
CH | 28.02.1995 | ||
LI | 28.02.1995 | ||
LU | 28.02.1995 | ||
SE | 25.04.1995 | ||
FR | 23.06.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 25.01.1995 | |
GB | 25.01.1995 | ||
IT | 25.01.1995 | ||
NL | 25.01.1995 | ||
AT | 14.02.1995 | ||
CH | 28.02.1995 | ||
LI | 28.02.1995 | ||
SE | 25.04.1995 | ||
FR | 23.06.1995 | ||
Former [1996/28] | BE | 25.01.1995 | |
GB | 25.01.1995 | ||
NL | 25.01.1995 | ||
AT | 14.02.1995 | ||
CH | 28.02.1995 | ||
LI | 28.02.1995 | ||
SE | 25.04.1995 | ||
FR | 23.06.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | BE | 25.01.1995 | |
GB | 25.01.1995 | ||
NL | 25.01.1995 | ||
CH | 28.02.1995 | ||
LI | 28.02.1995 | ||
SE | 25.04.1995 | ||
FR | 23.06.1995 | ||
Former [1996/03] | BE | 25.01.1995 | |
NL | 25.01.1995 | ||
CH | 28.02.1995 | ||
LI | 28.02.1995 | ||
SE | 25.04.1995 | ||
FR | 23.06.1995 | ||
Former [1996/02] | BE | 25.01.1995 | |
NL | 25.01.1995 | ||
CH | 28.02.1995 | ||
LI | 28.02.1995 | ||
FR | 23.06.1995 | ||
Former [1995/49] | BE | 25.01.1995 | |
NL | 25.01.1995 | ||
FR | 23.06.1995 | ||
Former [1995/42] | BE | 25.01.1995 | |
FR | 23.06.1995 | ||
Former [1995/41] | FR | 23.06.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2815434 (MORITA MFG); | [A]US4338576 (TAKAHASHI MINORU, et al); | [A]US4525790 (NAKAMURA MASAHIRO [JP]); | [Y]US4687962 (ELBERT LAWRENCE E [US]); | [X]EP0303944 (SATRONIC AG [CH]); | [A]US4808948 (PATEL DIPAKKUMAR I [US], et al) |