EP0443522 - Optical information recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.09.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.10.1997 [1997/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/35] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anezaki, Yoshikazu, c/o SONY MAGNETIC PRODUCTS INC 5-6, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Sasaki, Koji, c/o SONY MAGNETIC PRODUCTS INC 5-6, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1991/35] | Representative(s) | Müller, Frithjof E. Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/13] | Müller, Frithjof E., Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte MÜLLER & HOFFMANN, Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/35] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91102352.1 | 19.02.1991 | [1991/35] | Priority number, date | JP19900039795 | 22.02.1990 Original published format: JP 3979590 | JP19900294286 | 31.10.1990 Original published format: JP 29428690 | [1991/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0443522 | Date: | 28.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0443522 | Date: | 02.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0443522 | Date: | 30.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/24, G11B7/26 | [1991/35] | CPC: |
B29C39/00 (EP,US);
B29C39/28 (EP,US);
B29D17/005 (EP,US);
G11B7/24 (EP,US);
G11B7/263 (EP,US);
B29C2035/0827 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB [1991/35] | Title | German: | Optischer Informationsaufzeichnungsträger | [1991/35] | English: | Optical information recording medium | [1991/35] | French: | Milieu d'enregistrement d'information optique | [1991/35] | Examination procedure | 29.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/13] | 11.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0129225 (POLYGRAM GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP0280028 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0284387 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [A]EP0306316 (SONY CORP [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, unexamined applications, P field, vol. 11, no. 134, April 28, 1987 THE PATENT OFFICE JAPANESE GOVERNMENT page 76 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, unexamined applications, P field, vol. 11, no. 118, April 14, 1987 THE PATENT OFFICE JAPANESE GOVERNMENT page 165 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, unexamined applications, P field, vol. 9, no. 334, December 27, 1985 THE PATENT OFFICE JAPANESE GOVERNMENT page 86 |