EP0499668 - Improved blade assembly for slicing food products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.09.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.11.1993 [1993/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LAMB-WESTON, INC. 8701 West Gage Boulevard Tri-Cities Washington 99302 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/35] | For all designated states LAMB-WESTON, INC. 8701 West Gage Boulevard Tri-Cities Washington 99302 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Julian, John C. 1914 Hood Street Richland, Washington 99352 / US | 02 /
Phelps, David S. 5520 S.W. 78th Avenue, N.W. Gig Harbor, Washington 98335 / US | 03 /
Carvalho, Camilo 910 5th Street, N.E. Auburn, Washington 98002 / US | [1992/35] | Representative(s) | Brown, John D., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/35] | Brown, John David, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91102453.7 | 20.02.1991 | [1992/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0499668 | Date: | 26.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B26D3/18 | [1992/35] | CPC: |
B26D1/0006 (EP,US);
B26D3/185 (EP,US);
B26D2001/0033 (EP,US);
B26D2001/006 (EP,US);
Y10S83/932 (EP,US);
Y10T83/6472 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1992/35] | Title | German: | Verbessertes Messer zum Schneiden von Gemüse | [1992/35] | English: | Improved blade assembly for slicing food products | [1992/35] | French: | Couteau amélioré pour couper des produits alimentaires | [1992/35] | File destroyed: | 16.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 27.02.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/44] | 04.06.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1993/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 07.04.1993 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2513341 (VINCENT MARASCO); | [Y]EP0295004 (URSCHEL LAB INC [US]) |