EP0443602 - Distributor for igniting combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.01.1995 [1995/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | For all designated states NISSAN KOHKI CO., LTD. No.6-1, Okada 6-chome, Samukawa-machi Kouza-gun Kanagawa / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/35] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | ||
For all designated states NISSAN KOHKI CO., LTD. No.6-1, Okada 6-chome, Samukawa-machi Kouza-gun, Kanagawa / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kunimitsu, Toshiyuki, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K. K. Himeji Works, No. 840, Chiyoda-cho Himeji-shi, Hyogo / JP | [1991/35] | Representative(s) | Füchsle, Klaus, et al Hoffmann - Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/35] | Füchsle, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91102619.3 | 22.02.1991 | [1991/35] | Priority number, date | JP19900039780 | 22.02.1990 Original published format: JP 3978090 | [1991/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0443602 | Date: | 28.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0443602 | Date: | 27.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F02P7/10 | [1991/35] | CPC: |
F02P7/02 (KR);
F02P7/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/35] | Title | German: | Zündungsverteiler für Brennkraftmaschine | [1991/35] | English: | Distributor for igniting combustion engine | [1991/35] | French: | Distributeur d'allumage pour moteur à combustion | [1991/35] | File destroyed: | 06.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 28.04.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/03] | 19.08.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1995/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 06.06.1994 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1994 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2130894 (RATIER SA FOREST); | [Y]FR2155263 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [A]US3763841 (FROUMAJOU A); | [A]US4612816 (CHALIK LAZAR [US]); | [A]US4036074 (BODNAR ERNEST ROBERT); | [A]DE889094 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG); | [A]US3662726 (HASKEW HAROLD M, et al); | [A]EP0205344 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [X]JPS5943258 ; | [A]JPS63152769 ; | [A]JPS63176868 ; | [A]JPS556064 ; | JPS5870057 [ ] | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 008no. 146 (M-307)7 July 1984 & JP-A-59 043 258 ( HITACHI SEISAKUSHO KK ) 10 March 1984 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12no. 416 (M-759)4 November 1988 & JP-A-63 152 769 ( TAKASHI TAKAHASHI ) 25 June 1988 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12no. 445 (M-767)22 November 1988 & JP-A-63 176 868 ( TOSHIBA CORP ) 21 July 1988 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 4no. 33 (M-3)21 March 1980 & JP-A-55 006 064 ( MAZDA MOTOR CORP ) 17 January 1980 | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7no. 163 (M-229)16 July 1958 & JP-A-58 070 057 ( HITACHI SEISAKUSHO KK ) 26 April 1983 |