EP0460357 - Device for optical measurement of pressure differences [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.08.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Landis & Gyr Business Support AG 6301 Zug / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1993/24] | For all designated states Landis & Gyr Business Support AG CH-6301 Zug / CH | ||
Former [1991/50] | For all designated states Landis & Gyr Betriebs AG CH-6301 Zug / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beat, Hälg Allmendweg 7 CH-6330 Cham / CH | [1991/50] | Representative(s) | Müller, Hans-Jürgen, et al Müller Schupfner & Partner Patentanwälte Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Müller, Hans-Jürgen, et al Müller Schupfner & Partner Patentanwälte Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/42] | Müller, Hans-Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Hans-Jürgen Müller, Dipl.-Chem.Dr. Gerhard Schupfner, Dipl.-Ing. Hans-Peter Gauger, Postfach 101161 D-80085 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91102912.2 | 28.02.1991 | [1991/50] | Priority number, date | CH19900001928 | 08.06.1990 Original published format: CH 192890 | [1991/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0460357 | Date: | 11.12.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0460357 | Date: | 29.07.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G01L9/00 | [1991/50] | CPC: |
G01F1/38 (EP,US);
G01L9/0079 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/50] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum optischen Messen einer Druckdifferenz | [1991/50] | English: | Device for optical measurement of pressure differences | [1991/50] | French: | Dispositif de mesure optique d'une différence de pression | [1991/50] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 18.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/42] | 04.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/41] | 14.04.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1994 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0172623 (TECHNOLOGY DYNAMICS INC [US]); | [X]EP0196784 (ICI PLC [GB]); | [Y]GB2202936 (PLESSEY CO PLC) |