EP0444630 - Light-emitting semiconductor device using gallium nitride group compound [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.05.1998 [1998/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYODA GOSEI CO., LTD. 1, Nagahata, Ochiai, Haruhi-cho Nishikasugai-gun Aichi-ken / JP | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA CHUO KENKYUSHO 41-1, Aza Yokomichi Oaza Nagakute Nagakute-cho Aichi-gun Aichi-ken / JP | For all designated states NAGOYA UNIVERSITY Furo-Cho, Chikusa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | For all designated states Research Development Corporation of Japan 2-5-2, Nagato-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/20] | For all designated states TOYODA GOSEI CO., LTD. 1, Nagahata, Ochiai, Haruhi-cho Nishikasugai-gun Aichi-ken / JP | ||
For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA CHUO KENKYUSHO 41-1, Aza Yokomichi Oaza Nagakute Nagakute-cho Aichi-gun Aichi-ken / JP | |||
For all designated states NAGOYA UNIVERSITY Furo-Cho, Chikusa-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | |||
For all designated states RESEARCH DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION OF JAPAN 2-5-2, Nagato-cho Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
Former [1991/36] | For all designated states TOYODA GOSEI CO., LTD. 1, Nagahata, Ochiai, Haruhi-cho Nishikasugai-gun Aichi-ken / JP | ||
For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA CHUO KENKYUSHO 41-1, Aza Yokomichi Oaza Nagakute Nagakute-cho Aichi-gun Aichi-ken, 480-11 / JP | |||
For all designated states NAGOYA UNIVERSITY 1-banchi 1 Furocho Chikusa-Ku Nagoya-Shi Aichi-Ken / JP | |||
For all designated states RESEARCH DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION OF JAPAN 2-5-2, Nagato-cho Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Manabe, Katsuhide 50-6, Ipponmatsu, Menjo, Yamato-cho Ichinomiya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Mabuchi, Akira 4-26, Taisho-cho, Nakamura-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 03 /
Kato, Hisaki 2180-10, Iwasaki Komaki-shi, Aichi-ken, 485 / JP | 04 /
Sassa, Michinari 3-37, Maki-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 05 /
Koide, Norikatsu 1-409-2, Amakota, Moriyama-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 06 /
Yamazaki, Shiro 2-35-3, Ekimae Inazawa-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 07 /
Hashimoto, Masafumi 503, Mukaigaoka 3-chome, Tenpaku-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 08 /
Akasaki, Isamu 38-805, 1-ban, Joshin 1-chome, Nishi-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [1991/36] | Representative(s) | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/36] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91102921.3 | 27.02.1991 | [1991/36] | Priority number, date | JP19900050209 | 28.02.1990 Original published format: JP 5020990 | JP19900050210 | 28.02.1990 Original published format: JP 5021090 | JP19900050211 | 28.02.1990 Original published format: JP 5021190 | JP19900050212 | 28.02.1990 Original published format: JP 5021290 | [1991/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0444630 | Date: | 04.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0444630 | Date: | 21.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/00 | [1991/36] | CPC: |
H01L33/32 (EP,US);
H01L33/007 (EP,US);
H01L33/025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1991/36] | Title | German: | Lichtemittierende Halbleitervorrichtung mit Gallium-Nitrid-Verbindung | [1991/36] | English: | Light-emitting semiconductor device using gallium nitride group compound | [1991/36] | French: | Dispositif semi-conducteur émetteur de lumière comprenant un composé de nitride de gallium | [1991/36] | Examination procedure | 27.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/36] | 07.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2738329 (PHILIPS NV); | [X]DE3046018 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [AD]EP0277597 (TOYODA GOSEI KK [JP], et al); | [AD]US4855249 (AKASAKI ISAMU [JP], et al) |