EP0447864 - Dual-actuator safety switch for liquid sprayer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.1992 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.01.1993 [1993/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shop-Vac Corporation 2323 Reach Road Williamsport Pennsylvania / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/39] | For all designated states Shop-Vac Corporation 2323 Reach Road Williamsport Pennsylvania / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seasholtz, Craig A. P.O. Box 76 Avis, Pennsylvania / US | [1991/39] | Representative(s) | Weitzel, Wolfgang Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/39] | Weitzel, Wolfgang, Dr.-Ing. Friedenstrasse 10 D-89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 91103176.3 | 02.03.1991 | [1991/39] | Priority number, date | US19900497424 | 22.03.1990 Original published format: US 497424 | [1991/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0447864 | Date: | 25.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0447864 | Date: | 21.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B05B9/01 | [1991/39] | CPC: |
B05B9/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1991/39] | Title | German: | Doppelantriebssicherheitsschalter für Flüssigkeitszerstäuber | [1991/39] | English: | Dual-actuator safety switch for liquid sprayer | [1991/39] | French: | Interrupteur de sécurité double action pour pulvérisateur de liquide | [1991/39] | File destroyed: | 10.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 22.05.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/03] | 26.08.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1993/03] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2013527 (WOMA MAASBERG CO GMBH W); | [A]US4166579 (BEISE THEODORE W [US], et al); | [A]US4225087 (LAWLOR CHRISTOPHER); | [A]DE8714271U ; | [A]DE3826784 (URACA PUMPEN [DE]) |