EP0445820 - Process for making a needle with a three-dimensionally tapered point [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/37] | Process for making a device with a three-dimensionally tapered point | ||
[1995/29] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.07.1996 [1996/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETHICON, INC. U.S. Route 22 Somerville, New Jersey 08876 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/37] | For all designated states ETHICON INC. U.S. Route 22 Somerville New Jersey 08876 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Borysko, Emil 211 Love Road Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | 02 /
Hughes, Daniel 1023 Arnold Avenue Raritan, NJ 08869 / US | [1991/37] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/37] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91103513.7 | 07.03.1991 | [1991/37] | Priority number, date | US19900490117 | 07.03.1990 Original published format: US 490117 | [1991/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0445820 | Date: | 11.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0445820 | Date: | 19.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/06 | [1991/37] | CPC: |
B21G1/08 (EP,US);
A61B17/06066 (EP,US);
B23P15/40 (EP,US);
G03F7/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, LI [1991/37] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen eines dreidimensionalen Nadelspitzenprofils | [1995/29] | English: | Process for making a needle with a three-dimensionally tapered point | [1995/29] | French: | Procédé de fabrication pour obtenir une aiguille à pointes à profil tridimensionelle | [1995/29] |
Former [1991/37] | Verfahren zum Herstellen eines dreidimensionalen Spitzenprofils | ||
Former [1991/37] | Process for making a device with a three-dimensionally tapered point | ||
Former [1991/37] | Procédé de fabrication pour obtenir des pointes à profil tridimensionnel | Examination procedure | 02.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/18] | 12.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0185523 (ETHICON INC [US]) |