EP0447901 - Tool for setting of expandable rivets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adolf Würth GmbH & Co. KG Maienweg 10 D-74653 Künzelsau / DE | [1991/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haberstroh, Hardy Albrecht-Dürer-Strasse 11 W-7741 Schönwald / DE | 02 /
Bauer, Roland Falkenstrasse 2 W-7113 Neuenstein / DE | [1991/39] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/19] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Beier, Schöndorf und Mütschele Willy-Brandt-Strasse 28 D-70173 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1991/39] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Beier, Schöndorf und Mütschele Neckarstrasse 50 D-70173 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 91103633.3 | 09.03.1991 | [1991/39] | Priority number, date | DE19904008829 | 20.03.1990 Original published format: DE 4008829 | [1991/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0447901 | Date: | 25.09.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0447901 | Date: | 15.02.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B21J15/10, B21J15/00, F16B19/10 | [1991/39] | CPC: |
B21J15/383 (EP);
B21J15/041 (EP);
F16B19/1081 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/39] | Title | German: | Werkzeug zum Setzen von Spreiznieten | [1991/39] | English: | Tool for setting of expandable rivets | [1991/39] | French: | Outillage pour poser des rivets expansibles | [1991/39] | Examination procedure | 12.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/07] | 26.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 15.02.1995 | DK | 15.02.1995 | ES | 15.02.1995 | FR | 15.02.1995 | GB | 15.02.1995 | GR | 15.02.1995 | IT | 15.02.1995 | NL | 15.02.1995 | AT | 09.03.1995 | CH | 31.03.1995 | LI | 31.03.1995 | LU | 31.03.1995 | SE | 15.05.1995 | [2004/35] |
Former [2002/25] | BE | 15.02.1995 | |
DK | 15.02.1995 | ||
ES | 15.02.1995 | ||
GB | 15.02.1995 | ||
GR | 15.02.1995 | ||
IT | 15.02.1995 | ||
NL | 15.02.1995 | ||
AT | 09.03.1995 | ||
CH | 31.03.1995 | ||
LI | 31.03.1995 | ||
LU | 31.03.1995 | ||
SE | 15.05.1995 | ||
FR | 13.07.1995 | ||
Former [2000/05] | BE | 15.02.1995 | |
DK | 15.02.1995 | ||
GB | 15.02.1995 | ||
GR | 15.02.1995 | ||
IT | 15.02.1995 | ||
NL | 15.02.1995 | ||
AT | 09.03.1995 | ||
CH | 31.03.1995 | ||
LI | 31.03.1995 | ||
LU | 31.03.1995 | ||
SE | 15.05.1995 | ||
FR | 13.07.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 15.02.1995 | |
DK | 15.02.1995 | ||
GB | 15.02.1995 | ||
IT | 15.02.1995 | ||
NL | 15.02.1995 | ||
AT | 09.03.1995 | ||
CH | 31.03.1995 | ||
LI | 31.03.1995 | ||
SE | 15.05.1995 | ||
FR | 13.07.1995 | ||
Former [1998/15] | BE | 15.02.1995 | |
DK | 15.02.1995 | ||
GB | 15.02.1995 | ||
NL | 15.02.1995 | ||
AT | 09.03.1995 | ||
CH | 31.03.1995 | ||
LI | 31.03.1995 | ||
SE | 15.05.1995 | ||
FR | 13.07.1995 | ||
Former [1996/42] | BE | 15.02.1995 | |
GB | 15.02.1995 | ||
NL | 15.02.1995 | ||
AT | 09.03.1995 | ||
CH | 31.03.1995 | ||
LI | 31.03.1995 | ||
SE | 15.05.1995 | ||
FR | 13.07.1995 | ||
Former [1996/18] | BE | 15.02.1995 | |
GB | 15.02.1995 | ||
NL | 15.02.1995 | ||
CH | 31.03.1995 | ||
LI | 31.03.1995 | ||
SE | 15.05.1995 | ||
FR | 13.07.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | BE | 15.02.1995 | |
GB | 15.02.1995 | ||
NL | 15.02.1995 | ||
SE | 15.05.1995 | ||
FR | 13.07.1995 | ||
Former [1995/52] | NL | 15.02.1995 | |
FR | 13.07.1995 | ||
Former [1995/49] | NL | 15.02.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0065111 (MARTO AG [CH]); | [A]EP0066792 (ROTH PAUL); | [A]US4709841 (WOLLAR BURNELL [US]); | [A]DE3731807 (STOEGER LORENZ) |