EP0449034 - Cyclic ketones, method for their preparation and their application in perfumery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1995 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.12.1995 [1995/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Firmenich SA 1, route des Jeunes 1211 Genève 8 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1991/40] | For all designated states FIRMENICH SA 1, route des Jeunes CH-1211 Genève 8 / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chapuis, Christian 5, Vy de Montorge CH-1295 Mies / CH | 02 /
Schulte-Elte, Karl-Heinrich 44, chemin Carabot CH-1213 Onex / CH | 03 /
Pamingle, Hervé 3, chemin Ami-Argand CH-1290 Versoix / CH | 04 /
Margot, Christian Chemin de la Ravière CH-1261 Bassins / CH | [1991/40] | Representative(s) | Salvadori, Giuseppe c/o Firmenich S.A. Case Postale 239 1211 Genève 8 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1991/40] | Salvadori, Giuseppe, Dr. c/o Firmenich S.A. Case Postale 239 CH-1211 Genève 8 / CH | Application number, filing date | 91103803.2 | 13.03.1991 | [1991/40] | Priority number, date | CH19900000997 | 26.03.1990 Original published format: CH 99790 | [1991/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0449034 | Date: | 02.10.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0449034 | Date: | 28.12.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07C49/11, C07C49/21, C07C45/72, C07C45/73, C07C47/225, C07D303/04, A61K7/46 | [1991/40] | CPC: |
C07C403/16 (EP,US);
C07C33/14 (EP,US);
C07C45/305 (EP,US);
C07C45/58 (EP,US);
C07C45/62 (EP,US);
C07C47/30 (EP,US);
C07C47/42 (EP,US);
C07C47/45 (EP,US);
C07C49/11 (EP,US);
C07C49/21 (EP,US);
C07C69/75 (EP,US);
C07D303/04 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C45/305, C07C47/42 (US,EP);
C07C45/305, C07C47/45 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1991/40] | Title | German: | Cyclische Ketone, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und deren Verwendung als Riechstoffe | [1991/40] | English: | Cyclic ketones, method for their preparation and their application in perfumery | [1991/40] | French: | Cétones cycliques nouvelles, procédé pour leur préparation et leur utilisation en parfumerie | [1991/40] | Examination procedure | 13.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/40] | 03.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 21.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 29.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP62051637 ; | [X]JP61243041 ; | [X]FR2404616 (ROBERTET & CIE P [FR]); | [X]EP0075237 (BASF AG [DE]); | [AD]EP0121828 (FIRMENICH & CIE [CH]); | [APD]EP0374509 (FIRMENICH & CIE [CH]) | [X] - "Chemical Abstracts Registry Handbook [1965-1971] [R1] 1R-2024R" 1974, American Chemical Society, Columbus, Ohio, US | [X] - HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA. vol. 72, no. 6, 20 septembre 1989, BASEL CH pages 1400 - 1415; B. Maurer et al.: "New Irone-Related Constituents from the Essential Oil of Iris Germanica L." | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 242 (C-438)(2689) 07 août 1987, & JP-A-62 051637 (T. HASEGAWA) 06 mars 1987,, & JP62051637 A 00000000 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 89 (C-411)(2536) 19 mars 1987, & JP-A-61 243041 (T. HASEGAWA) 29 octobre 1986,, & JP61243041 A 00000000 |