EP0504437 - Procedure and windtunnel balance determining the forces and moments on a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.01.1996 [1996/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CARL SCHENCK AG 64273 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/39] | For all designated states CARL SCHENCK AG D-64273 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Polansky-Schmülling-Ziegert, Lubomir Am Schäfergraben 7 W-6944 Hemsbach / DE | 02 /
Giesecke, Peter, Prof. Dr. Spessartstrasse 120 W-6200 Wiesbaden / DE | [1995/02] |
Former [1992/39] | 01 /
Polansky-Schmülling-Ziegert, Lubomir Am Schäfergraben 7 W-6944 Hemsbach / DE | ||
02 /
Giesecke, Peter, Prof.Dr. Spessartstrasse 120 W-6200 Wiesbaden / DE | Representative(s) | Brandt, Ernst-Ulrich Carl Schenck AG Patentabteilung 64273 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/39] | Brandt, Ernst-Ulrich, Dipl.-Phys., Dipl.-Ing. Carl Schenck AG Patentabteilung D-64273 Darmstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 91104080.6 | 16.03.1991 | [1992/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0504437 | Date: | 23.09.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0504437 | Date: | 11.01.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01M9/00, G01L5/16 | [1992/39] | CPC: |
G01M9/062 (EP,US);
G01L5/171 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1992/47] |
Former [1992/39] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Windkanalwaage zur Ermittlung der Kräfte und Momente an einem Fahrzeug | [1992/39] | English: | Procedure and windtunnel balance determining the forces and moments on a vehicle | [1992/39] | French: | Procédé et balance pour essais en soufflerie aérodynamique pour déterminer les forces et les moments sur un véhicule | [1992/39] | Examination procedure | 17.03.1992 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, GR, LU, SE | 26.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/17] | 17.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.04.1992 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.1992 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.1992 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.1992 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.1992 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.1992 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.1992 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.1992 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0168527 (SCHENCK AG CARL [DE]); | [AD]DE3715460 (PFISTER GMBH) | [A] - ICIACF '89,Göttingen,DE,Sept. 18-21,1989, IEEE Publication 89 CH2762-3 T.Preusser et al.:"External 6-Component Wind Tunnel Balancies For Aerospace Simulation Facilities." |