EP0504438 - Automobile testing station [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.11.1994 Database last updated on 11.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.01.1995 [1995/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CARL SCHENCK AG 64273 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/39] | For all designated states CARL SCHENCK AG D-64273 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Storck, Karlheinz, Dr. Waldstrasse 84 W-6109 Mühltal 2 / DE | [1992/39] | Representative(s) | Brandt, Ernst-Ulrich Carl Schenck AG Patentabteilung 64273 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/39] | Brandt, Ernst-Ulrich, Dipl.-Phys., Dipl.-Ing. Carl Schenck AG Patentabteilung D-64273 Darmstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 91104108.5 | 16.03.1991 | [1992/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0504438 | Date: | 23.09.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01B5/255 | [1992/39] | CPC: |
G01B5/255 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/47] |
Former [1992/39] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Fahrzeugprüfstand | [1992/39] | English: | Automobile testing station | [1992/39] | French: | Banc pour tester des véhicules | [1992/39] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 17.03.1992 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) DK, GR, LU | 26.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/17] | 01.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/01] | 11.08.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.04.1992 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.1992 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.1992 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1994 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2263500 ; | [A]EP0199913 ; | [A]EP0011492 ; | [A]GB2179460 ; | [A]US3453740 ; | [A]US2025051 |