EP0451574 - Device to tension plates onto a form cylinder of a rotary printing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.1995 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.06.1995 [1995/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Postfach 10 12 64 63012 Offenbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/42] | For all designated states MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Postfach 10 12 64 D-63012 Offenbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reichel, Klaus T. Am Fischertor 5 W-8900 Augsburg 1 / DE | [1991/42] | Application number, filing date | 91104495.6 | 22.03.1991 | [1991/42] | Priority number, date | DE19900004130U | 10.04.1990 Original published format: DE 9004130 U | [1991/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0451574 | Date: | 16.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0451574 | Date: | 15.06.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B41F27/12 | [1991/42] | CPC: |
B41F27/125 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1991/42] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Spannen von Platten auf einen Formzylinder einer Rotationsdruckmaschine | [1991/42] | English: | Device to tension plates onto a form cylinder of a rotary printing machine | [1991/42] | French: | Dispositif pour tendre des plaques sur un cylindre de cliché d'une machine à imprimer rotative | [1991/42] | Examination procedure | 04.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/49] | 05.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]DE3339185 ; | [Y]US4495865 (KAMODA HIROYOSHI [JP]); | [Y]EP0330736 (ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORP [US]) |