EP0449129 - Internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.1995 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Klöckner-Humboldt-Deutz Aktiengesellschaft Nikolaus-August-Otto-Allee 2 51149 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/03] | For all designated states Klöckner-Humboldt-Deutz Aktiengesellschaft Nikolaus-August-Otto-Allee 2 D-51149 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1991/40] | For all designated states Klöckner-Humboldt-Deutz Aktiengesellschaft Nikolaus-August-Otto-Allee 2 D-51149 Köln / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weitzenbürger, Hans, Dipl.-Ing. Getrudenstrasse 18 W-5000 Köln 90 / DE | 02 /
Esche, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. Schmittgasse 91 W-5000 Köln 90 / DE | 03 /
Klocke, Michael, Dipl.-Ing. Charlottenstrasse 12 W-5650 Solingen 19 / DE | 04 /
Nolte, Albert, Dipl.-Ing. Vasterstrasse 10 W-5000 Köln 30 / DE | [1991/40] | Application number, filing date | 91104511.0 | 22.03.1991 | [1991/40] | Priority number, date | deleted | [1992/18] |
Former [1991/40] | deleted | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0449129 | Date: | 02.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0449129 | Date: | 27.04.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F01P5/06, F01P3/18, F01P3/22 | [1991/40] | CPC: |
F01P3/2207 (EP,US);
F01P3/18 (EP,US);
F01P5/06 (EP,US);
F01P2003/003 (EP,US);
F01P2003/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1991/40] | Title | German: | Brennkraftmaschine | [1991/40] | English: | Internal combustion engine | [1991/40] | French: | Moteur à combustion interne | [1991/40] | Examination procedure | 31.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/43] | 06.11.1991 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 29.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 01 | 17.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 27.04.1994 | [2002/25] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1080273 (GRATZMULLER JEAN LOUIS); | [A]GB372793 (SPONTAN OF LIDINGO III AB); | [A]US1649246 (GEORGE MORRISEY); | [A]GB2127487 (STABILIMENTI MECCANICI VM SPA); | [A]DE2747973 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG); | [A]DE3540488 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG [DE]); | [AD]DE1194202 (CARL KAELBLE G M B H MOTOREN U); | [A]FR904786 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG); | [A]US4550694 (EVANS JOHN W [US]); | [A]EP0044348 (MASCHF AUGSBURG NUERNBERG AG [DE]) | [A] - RAILWAY GAZETTE INTERNATIONAL. vol. 124, no. 18, 20 September 1968, LONDON GB Seiten 709 - 710; "Voith cooling units for diesel-hydraulic locomotives" |