EP0455979 - Procedure for the production of a vial for spirit level [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/46] | Vial for spirit level | ||
[1994/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.1994 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.01.1995 [1995/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYERISCHE MASS-INDUSTRIE ARNO KELLER GMBH Rosengasse 12 91217 Hersbruck / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/46] | For all designated states BAYERISCHE MASS-INDUSTRIE ARNO KELLER GMBH Rosengasse 12 D-91217 Hersbruck / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keller, Hans Zolltafel 16 W-8562 Hersbruck / DE | 02 /
Dengler, Herbert Breslauer Str. 5 W-8562 Hersbruck / DE | [1991/46] | Representative(s) | Matschkur, Lindner, Blaumeier Postfach 11 91 09 90101 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/46] | Matschkur, Götz, Lindner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 11 91 09 D-90101 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 91104698.5 | 26.03.1991 | [1991/46] | Priority number, date | DE19904014638 | 08.05.1990 Original published format: DE 4014638 | [1991/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0455979 | Date: | 13.11.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0455979 | Date: | 27.12.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0455979 | Date: | 12.01.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01C9/34 | [1991/46] | CPC: |
G01C9/34 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT [1991/46] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Libelle für Wasserwaagen | [1994/02] | English: | Procedure for the production of a vial for spirit level | [1994/02] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une fiole pour niveau à bulle | [1994/02] |
Former [1991/46] | Libelle für Wasserwaagen | ||
Former [1991/46] | Vial for spirit level | ||
Former [1991/46] | Fiole pour niveau à bulle | Examination procedure | 01.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/14] | 28.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1147312 ; | [A]FR1448855 (O N M SOC); | [A]CH575593 (WULLSCHLEGER A AG); | [X]FR2449868 (STANLEY MABO) |