EP0449188 - Vehicle wheel, wheel rim and protective trim [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Aktiengesellschaft Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/40] | For all designated states Continental Aktiengesellschaft Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 D-30165 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pfeiffer, Hans D. Herschelstrasse 27 W-3008 Garbsen 4 / DE | 02 /
Mauruschat, Rainer Schützenstrasse 32 W-3008 Garbsen 7 / DE | [1991/40] | Application number, filing date | 91104713.2 | 26.03.1991 | [1991/40] | Priority number, date | DE19904009757 | 27.03.1990 Original published format: DE 4009757 | [1991/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0449188 | Date: | 02.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0449188 | Date: | 24.11.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B60B7/01 | [1991/40] | CPC: |
B60B7/01 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1991/40] | Title | German: | Fahrzeugrad, Felge für Fahrzeugrad und Felgenschutzring | [1991/40] | English: | Vehicle wheel, wheel rim and protective trim | [1991/40] | French: | Roue de véhicule, jante de roue et cercle enjoliveur protecteur | [1991/40] | Examination procedure | 22.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/42] | 26.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2822219 (BILLINGSLEY WILLIAM F); | [X]US2901292 (WOOD EDWARD L); | [X]US2964354 (ASKE JR CHARLES B, et al); | [A]FR2328583 (CONNELL JAMES [US]); | [A]GB1124726 (MICHELIN & CIE) | by applicant | DE1123932 | US3081132 | US4523789 | US3883182 | US3036866 | US3597002 | US3048444 | EP0022741 |