EP0453809 - Device for producing clear ice lumps [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/44] | Device for producing clear ice lumps and control circuit therefor | ||
[1993/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.11.1994 [1994/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gaggenau-Werke Haus- und Lufttechnik GmbH Eisenwerkstrasse 11 D-76571 Gaggenau / DE | [1991/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [1991/44] | Representative(s) | Moser, Herbert Patentanwalt Ettlinger Strasse 2 c 76137 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/44] | Moser, Herbert, Dr.-Ing. Nowackanlage 15 D-76137 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 91104975.7 | 28.03.1991 | [1991/44] | Priority number, date | DE19904012249 | 14.04.1990 Original published format: DE 4012249 | [1991/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0453809 | Date: | 30.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0453809 | Date: | 06.05.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0453809 | Date: | 24.11.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F25C1/08 | [1991/44] | CPC: |
F25C1/08 (EP,US);
F25B2600/2511 (EP,US);
Y02P60/85 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/44] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Klareisstücken | [1993/47] | English: | Device for producing clear ice lumps | [1993/47] | French: | Dispositif pour la fabrication de morceaux de glace transparente | [1993/47] |
Former [1991/44] | Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Klareisstücken und Steuerschaltung hierzu | ||
Former [1991/44] | Device for producing clear ice lumps and control circuit therefor | ||
Former [1991/44] | Dispositif pour la fabrication de morceaux de glace transparente et circuit de contrôle pour celui-ci | Examination procedure | 23.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/39] | 09.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2718125 (HORVAY JULIUS B); | [A]US3433030 (JACOBS JAMES W); | [A]GB2189016 (BROWN JOHN JAMES); | [AD]EP0333887 (WESSA THEO); | [XP]DE9004370U |