EP0451692 - Refrigerant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 19.10.2001 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LIMITED Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/42] | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LIMITED Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Omure, Yukio c/o Yodogawa Seisakusho of Daikin Industries Ltd 1/1, Nishihitotsuya, Settsu-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 02 /
Noguchi, Masahiro c/o Yodogawa Seisakusho of Daikin Industries Ltd 1/1 Nishihitotsuya, Settsu-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 03 /
Fujiwara, Katsuki c/o Yodogawa Seisakusho of Daikin Industries Ltd 1/1 Nishihitotsuya, Settsu-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 04 /
Momota, Hiroshi c/o Yodogawa Seisakusho of Daikin Industries Ltd 1/1 Nishihitotsuya, Settsu-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [1991/42] | Representative(s) | Lethem, David James Hoffmann - Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/31] | Lethem, David James Hoffmann Eitle & Partner, Sardinia House, 52 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LZ / GB | ||
Former [1997/44] | Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner GbR Patentanwälte, Postfach 3929 65029 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1991/42] | Schüler, Horst, Dr. Patentanwalt, Kaiserstrasse 69 D-60329 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 91105295.9 | 03.04.1991 | [1991/42] | Priority number, date | JP19900090775 | 04.04.1990 Original published format: JP 9077590 | [1991/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0451692 | Date: | 16.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0451692 | Date: | 18.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0451692 | Date: | 04.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C09K5/04, C09K5/00 | [1992/12] | CPC: |
C09K5/045 (EP,US);
C09K2205/22 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/42] | C09K5/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1991/42] | Title | German: | Kühlmittel | [1991/42] | English: | Refrigerant | [1991/42] | French: | Réfrigérant | [1991/42] | Examination procedure | 17.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/46] | 29.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP94110634.6 / EP0626434 | EP94110635.3 / EP0626435 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.04.1997
09.05.1997
ADMISSIBLE Imperial Chemical Industries PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB Opponent's representative Dee, Ian Mark Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | 02
02.06.1997
17.06.1997
ADMISSIBLE AUSIMONT S.p.A. Piazetta Maurilio Bossi, 3 20121 Milano / IT Opponent's representative Sama, Daniele Sama Patents Via G.B. Morgagni, 2 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/28] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.04.1997
09.05.1997
ADMISSIBLE Imperial Chemical Industries PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB Opponent's representative Dee, Ian Mark Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
02
02.06.1997
17.06.1997
ADMISSIBLE AUSIMONT S.p.A. Piazetta Maurilio Bossi, 3 20121 Milano / IT Opponent's representative Sama, Daniele Sama Patents, Via G.B. Morgagni, 2 20129 Milano / IT | |||
Former [1997/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.04.1997
09.05.1997
ADMISSIBLE Imperial Chemical Industries PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB Opponent's representative Dee, Ian Mark Intellectual Property Department ICI Chemicals & Polymers Limited P.O. Box 11 The Heath Runcorn, Cheshire WA7 4QE / GB | ||
02
02.06.1997
17.06.1997
ADMISSIBLE AUSIMONT S.p.A. Piazetta Maurilio Bossi, 3 20121 Milano / IT Opponent's representative Sama, Daniele Sama Patents, Via G.B. Morgagni, 2 20129 Milano / IT | |||
Former [1997/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.04.1997
09.05.1997
ADMISSIBLE Imperial Chemical Industries PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB Opponent's representative Dee, Ian Mark Intellectual Property Department ICI Chemicals & Polymers Limited P.O. Box 11 The Heath Runcorn, Cheshire WA7 4QE / GB | 15.07.1997 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.03.1998 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 21.06.1999 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.07.1999 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 23.07.1999 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 31.07.2001 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2001/49] | 31.07.2001 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 03.09.1999 | Appeal received No. T0877/99 | 23.09.1999 | Statement of grounds filed | 01.03.2001 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2001/09] | 12.10.2001 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | 12.10.2001 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 31.07.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.08.2001 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP01108291 ; | [X]EP0299614 (DU PONT [US]); | [A]EP0349647 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 13, no. 328 (C-621)[3676] 24 July 1989; & JP-A-01 108 291 (DAIKIN IND LTD.) 25 April 1989, & JP01108291 A 19890425 |