EP0451753 - In the ethylenic moiety substituted phenylalkylethylenediamine-platinum (II or IV) derivatives and phenylalkyl-ethylenediamines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.1994 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.06.1994 [1994/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASTA Medica Aktiengesellschaft An der Pikardie 10 01277 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/29] | For all designated states ASTA Medica Aktiengesellschaft An der Pikardie 10 D-01277 Dresden / DE | ||
Former [1992/07] | For all designated states ASTA Medica Aktiengesellschaft Weismüllerstrasse 45 D-60314 Frankfurt / DE | ||
Former [1991/42] | For all designated states ASTA Pharma AG Weismüllerstrasse 45 D-6000 Frankfurt am Main 1 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brunner, Henri, Prof. Eichendorffstrasse 14 W-8417 Lappersdorf / DE | 02 /
Hankofer, Peter, Dr. Rybnikerstrasse 8 W-5000 Köln 80 / DE | 03 /
Maiterth, Friedrich Brunnthalerstrasse 6 W-8401 Hagelstadt / DE | 04 /
Engel, Jürgen, Prof. Erlenweg 3 W-8755 Alzenau / DE | 05 /
Schumacher, Wolfgang, Dr. Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 37 W-6070 Langen / DE | 06 /
Hilgard, Peter, Dr. Kronenstrasse 11a W-4800 Bielefeld / DE | 07 /
Voegeli, Rainer, Dr. Bretonische Strasse 67 W-4800 Bielefeld / DE | [1991/42] | Application number, filing date | 91105514.3 | 08.04.1991 | [1991/42] | Priority number, date | DE19904011520 | 10.04.1990 Original published format: DE 4011520 | [1991/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0451753 | Date: | 16.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07C211/27, C07F15/00, A61K31/28 | [1991/42] | CPC: |
C07D311/68 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07C211/27 (EP,US);
C07C211/28 (EP,US);
C07C211/41 (EP,US);
C07C211/42 (EP,US);
C07C215/52 (EP,US);
C07C217/60 (EP,US);
C07C217/62 (EP,US);
C07D217/14 (EP,US);
C07F15/0093 (EP,US);
C08B37/0015 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/42] | Title | German: | Im Ethylenteil substituierte Phenyl-alkylethylendiamin-Platin (II oder IV)-Derivate und Phenylalkyl-ethylendiamine | [1991/42] | English: | In the ethylenic moiety substituted phenylalkylethylenediamine-platinum (II or IV) derivatives and phenylalkyl-ethylenediamines | [1991/42] | French: | Dérivés de phénylalkyl éthylène diamine-platine (II ou IV) substitués dans la partie éthylénique et phénylalkyl éthylène-diamines | [1991/42] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 08.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/42] | 05.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 15.04.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0193083 (ASTA WERKE AG CHEM FAB [DE]) | [XP] - CHEMISCHE BERICHTE. vol. 123, no. 5, Mai 1990, WEINHEIM, DE; Seiten 1029 - 1038; HENRI BRUNNER ET AL.: "SYNTHESIS AND ANTITUMOR ACTIVITY OF PtÄIIÜ_COMPLEXES OF BENZYL-1,2-DIAMINOETHANE LIGANDS" | [X] - BULLETIN OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, vol. 56, no. 11, 1983, TOKYO, JP; Seiten 3268 - 3271; WAKAKO KANDA ET AL.: "SYNTHESIS AND CHARACTERIZATION OF A NEW QUINQUEDENTATE LIGAND CONSISTING OF SALEN SKELETON AND PHENOLIC TAIL CAPABLE OF AXIAL COORDINATION AND ITS METAL COMPLEXES" | [X] - JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, vol. 109, no. 10, 13 Mai 1987, GASTON, PA, US; Seiten 3152 - 3154; ERIC J. ROSKAMP ET AL.: "CONVENIENT ROUTES TO VICINAL DIAMINES. COUPLING OF NITRILES OR N-ÄTRIMETHYLSILYLÜIMINES PROMOTED BY NbCL4[THFÜ2" | [A] - EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 25, no. 1, Januar 1990, ELSEVIER, PARIS, FR; Seiten 35 - 44; HENRI BRUNNER ET AL.: "SYNTHESIS AND ANTITUMOR ACTIVITY OF PLATINUMÄIIÜ COMPLEXES CONTAINING SUBSTITUTED ETHYLENEDIAMINE LIGANDS" | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 109, no. 21, 21 November 1988 Columbus, Ohio, USA GEORGIADIS MINAS P. ET AL.: "PRODUCTS FROM FURANS. V. SYNTHESIS OF OXYGEN-CONTAINING ISOSTERES OF SYMPATHOMIMETIC AMINES VIA 6-HYDROXY-2H-PYRAN-3[6H]-ONES AND ....." & J. HETEROCYCL. CHEM. 1988 BD 25[3] SEITEN 995-1002 EP 91105514030Seite 690; rechte Spalte; ref. no. 190186E | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 109, no. 21, 21 November 1988 Columbus, Ohio, USA; GEORGIADIS MINAS P. ET AL.: "PRODUCTS FROM FURANS. V. SYNTHESIS OF OXYGEN-CONTAINING ISOSTERES OF SYMPATHOMIMETIC AMINES VIA 6-HYDROXY-2H-PYRAN-3[6HÜ-ONES AND .....", & J. HETEROCYCL. CHEM. 1988 BD 25[3] SEITEN 995-1002, Seite 690; rechte Spalte; ref. no. 190186E |