EP0455998 - Sanitary fitting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 03.10.1997 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KWC AG Hauptstrasse 130 CH-5726 Unterkulm / CH | [1991/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gloor, Roland Rebackerweg 217 CH-5732 Zetzwil / CH | [1991/46] | Representative(s) | Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Bellerivestrasse 20 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1991/46] | Patentanwälte Schaad, Balass & Partner AG Dufourstrasse 101 Postfach CH-8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 91105618.2 | 09.04.1991 | [1991/46] | Priority number, date | CH19900001556 | 08.05.1990 Original published format: CH 155690 | [1991/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0455998 | Date: | 13.11.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0455998 | Date: | 07.07.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | E03C1/04, E03C1/10 | [1991/46] | CPC: |
E03C1/104 (EP,US);
E03C1/108 (EP,US);
Y10T137/3331 (EP,US);
Y10T137/9464 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, IT [1991/46] | Title | German: | Sanitäre Armatur | [1991/46] | English: | Sanitary fitting | [1991/46] | French: | Installation sanitaire | [1991/46] | Examination procedure | 16.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/46] | 16.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.12.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.03.1994
27.04.1994
ADMISSIBLE Friedrich Grohe Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 1361 D-58653 Hemer / DE | [1994/19] | 30.03.1994 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 13.04.1994 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 17.05.1994 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.09.1994 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.09.1994 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 05.11.1994 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 18.06.1997 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1997/47] | 18.06.1997 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 09.03.1995 | Appeal received No. T0213/95 | 20.05.1995 | Statement of grounds filed | 18.06.1997 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 18.06.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.08.1997 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.04.1996 | ES | 10.04.1996 | FR | 27.12.1996 | DE | 01.01.1997 | [2004/38] |
Former [1997/34] | AT | 09.04.1996 | |
FR | 27.12.1996 | ||
DE | 01.01.1997 | ||
Former [1997/29] | AT | 09.04.1996 | |
DE | 01.01.1997 | ||
Former [1997/16] | AT | 09.04.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3424188 (WHITAKER WATFORD C, et al); | [AD]DE3603503 (GROHE ARMATUREN FRIEDRICH [DE]); | [A]DE8813390U |