EP0451836 - Difluoroglutamic acid conjugates with folates and anti-folates for the treatment of neoplastic diseases [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1996 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 19.11.2003 [2003/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEALTH RESEARCH, INC. Roswell Park Division, 666 Elm Street Buffalo NY 14263 / US | For all designated states MERRELL PHARMACEUTICALS INC. 2110 East Galbraith Road, P.O. Box 156300 Cincinnati Ohio 45215-6300 / US | For all designated states THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF MICHIGAN 3003 S. State Street Wolverine Tower, Room 2071 Ann Arbor, Michigan 48109-1280 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/32] | For all designated states HEALTH RESEARCH, INC. Roswell Park Division, 666 Elm Street Buffalo, NY 14263 / US | ||
For all designated states MERRELL PHARMACEUTICALS INC. 2110 East Galbraith Road, P.O. Box 156300 Cincinnati, Ohio 45215-6300 / US | |||
For all designated states THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF MICHIGAN 3003 S. State Street Wolverine Tower, Room 2071 Ann Arbor Michigan 48109-1280 / US | |||
Former [1996/21] | For all designated states HEALTH RESEARCH INCORPORATED 66 Hackett Boulevard, 3rd Floor Albany NY 12209 / US | ||
For all designated states MERRELL PHARMACEUTICALS INC. 2110 East Galbraith Road, P.O. Box 156300 Cincinnati, Ohio 45215-6300 / US | |||
For all designated states THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF MICHIGAN Technology Management Office, Wolverline Towers, Room 2071, 3003 South State Street Ann Arbor, Michigan 48109-1280 / US | |||
Former [1996/20] | For all designated states HEALTH RESEARCH INCORPORATED 66 Hackett Boulevard, 3rd Floor Albany NY 12209 / US | ||
For all designated states MERRELL PHARMACEUTICALS INC. 2110 East Galbraith Road, P.O. Box 156300 Cincinnati, Ohio 45215-6300 / US | |||
For all designated states THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF MICHIGAN 3003 S. State Street Wolverine Tower, Room 2071 Ann Arbor Michigan 48109-1280 / US | |||
Former [1996/16] | For all designated states HEALTH RESEARCH INCORPORATED 66 Hackett Boulevard, 3rd Floor Albany NY 12209 / US | ||
For all designated states MERRELL DOW PHARMACEUTICALS INC. P.O. Box 156300 2110 East Galbraith Road Cincinnati Ohio 45215-6300 / US | |||
For all designated states THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF MICHIGAN 3003 S. State Street Wolverine Tower, Room 2071 Ann Arbor Michigan 48109-1280 / US | |||
Former [1995/24] | For all designated states HEALTH RESEARCH, INC. Roswell Park Division, 666 Elm Street Buffalo, NY 14263 / US | ||
For all designated states MERRELL DOW PHARMACEUTICALS INC. P.O. Box 156300 2110 East Galbraith Road Cincinnati Ohio 45215-6300 / US | |||
For all designated states THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF MICHIGAN 3003 S. State Street Wolverine Tower, Room 2071 Ann Arbor Michigan 48109-1280 / US | |||
Former [1991/42] | For all designated states HEALTH RESEARCH, INC. Roswell Park Division, 666 Elm Street Buffalo, NY 14263 / US | ||
For all designated states MERRELL DOW PHARMACEUTICALS INC. P.O. Box 156300 2110 East Galbraith Road Cincinnati Ohio 45215-6300 / US | |||
For all designated states THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF MICHIGAN 475 East Jefferson, Room 2354 Ann Arbor, Michigan 48109-1248 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bey, Philippe 7875 Ivygate Lane Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / US | 02 /
Coward, James K. 6 Haverhill Court Ann Arbor, Michigan 48105 / US | 03 /
McGuire, John J. 250 Knowlton Avenue Kenmore, New York 14217 / US | [1991/42] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/42] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91105768.5 | 11.04.1991 | [1991/42] | Priority number, date | US19900508873 | 12.04.1990 Original published format: US 508873 | [1991/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0451836 | Date: | 16.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0451836 | Date: | 01.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0451836 | Date: | 27.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07D475/08, A61K31/52 | [1991/42] | CPC: |
C07D475/08 (EP,US);
C07D475/00 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/42] | Title | German: | Konjugate von Difluoroglutaminsäure mit Fölaten und Antifölaten für die Behandlung von neoplastischen Krankheiten | [1991/42] | English: | Difluoroglutamic acid conjugates with folates and anti-folates for the treatment of neoplastic diseases | [1991/42] | French: | Conjugats de l'acide difluoroglutamique avec des folats et des antifolats pour le traitement de maladies néoplastiques | [1991/42] | Examination procedure | 23.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/08] | 13.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 27.12.1995 | NL | 27.12.1995 | DK | 27.03.1996 | SE | 27.03.1996 | LU | 30.04.1996 | [2003/47] |
Former [2003/07] | GR | 27.12.1995 | |
NL | 27.12.1995 | ||
SE | 27.03.1996 | ||
LU | 30.04.1996 | ||
Former [2000/05] | GR | 27.12.1995 | |
SE | 27.03.1996 | ||
LU | 30.04.1996 | ||
Former [1996/32] | SE | 27.03.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4584375 (COWARD JAMES K [US]) | [AP] - JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 265, no. 24, 25 August 1990, BALTIMORE, US; JOHN J. MC GUIRE: 'DL-3,3-Difluoroglutamate: An Enhancer of Folylpolyglutamate Elongation.' |