EP0456002 - Single crystal scintillator and apparatus for prospecting underground strata using same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.1997 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.10.1997 [1997/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd. 1-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/46] | For all designated states Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd. 1-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 160 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Akiyama, Seikichi 3977-35, Ishikawa-1-chome Mito-shi / JP | 02 /
Utsu, Takeshi 2-6, Onumacho-4-chome Hitachi-shi / JP | 03 /
Ishibashi, Hiroyuki, Hitachi Matsushiro Hausu 402 4-3, Matsushiro-3-chome Tsukuba-shi / JP | 04 /
Melcher, Charles L. 49 Lampost Drive West Redding, Connecticut 06896 / JP | 05 /
Schweitzer, Jeffrey S. 41 Silver Hill Road Ridgefield, Connecticut 06877 / JP | [1991/46] | Representative(s) | Kraus, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/46] | Kraus, Walter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 D-80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91105797.4 | 11.04.1991 | [1991/46] | Priority number, date | JP19900106292 | 20.04.1990 Original published format: JP 10629290 | [1991/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0456002 | Date: | 13.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0456002 | Date: | 10.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0456002 | Date: | 06.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G01T1/202 | [1991/46] | CPC: |
G01T1/202 (EP);
C09K11/77742 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, SE [1991/46] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Bestimmung der Eigenschaften von Erdformationen mittels einzelner Szintillationskristalldetektoren | [1991/46] | English: | Single crystal scintillator and apparatus for prospecting underground strata using same | [1991/46] | French: | Détecteur de scintillation monocristal pour l'exploration de couches géologiques | [1991/46] | Examination procedure | 03.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/18] | 03.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.05.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP63307380 ; | [Y]US4647781 (TAKAGI KAZUMASA [JP], et al); | [AD]EP0231693 (SCHLUMBERGER LTD [US], et al); | [Y]FR2634028 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) | [A] - DATABASE WPIL Week 895, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 89-035003 & JP-A-63 307 380 (HITACHI CHEMICAL KK) 15 December 1988, & JP63307380 A 19881215 |