EP0453901 - System and method for predicting the value of a compositional parameter of blood [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.10.1996 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.11.1996 [1996/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/44] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tusa, James K., c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufact. Co., 2501 Hudson Road, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
Miller, William W., c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufact. Co., 2501 Hudson Road, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [1991/44] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/44] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91105835.2 | 12.04.1991 | [1991/44] | Priority number, date | US19900514703 | 26.04.1990 Original published format: US 514703 | [1991/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0453901 | Date: | 30.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0453901 | Date: | 29.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, G06F17/00 | [1995/48] | CPC: |
A61B5/1455 (EP,US);
G01N33/4925 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/44] | A61B5/00, G06F15/42 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1991/44] | Title | German: | Anordnung und Verfahren zur Voraussage des Wertes von gemischten Blutparametern | [1991/44] | English: | System and method for predicting the value of a compositional parameter of blood | [1991/44] | French: | Système et méthode pour prévoir la valeur de paramètres sanguins composés | [1991/44] | Examination procedure | 29.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/26] | 27.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0336201 (BURKE & BURKE SNC [IT]); | [Y]DE2629402 (INST BIOMEDIZINISCHE TECHNIK); | [Y]DE2449988 (PHILIPS NV); | [A]US4649928 (SAMARAS GEORGE M [US], et al); | [AD]EP0354736 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) |