EP0509117 - Pressure fluid actuator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.1997 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.02.1997 [1997/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HYGRAMA AG Birkenstrasse 49 CH-6343 Rotkreuz / CH | [1992/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [1992/43] | Representative(s) | Klein, Adam, et al Patentanwälte Klein, Pinter & Laminger OEG, Prinz-Eugen-Strasse 70 1040 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/28] | Klein, Adam, Dipl.Ing., et al Patentanwälte Klein & Pinter OEG Fasangasse 49 A-1030 Wien / AT | ||
Former [1992/43] | Blum, Rudolf Emil Ernst c/o E. Blum & Co Patentanwälte Vorderberg 11 CH-8044 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 91106181.0 | 18.04.1991 | [1992/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0509117 | Date: | 21.10.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0509117 | Date: | 28.02.1996 | [1996/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F15B15/08 | [1992/43] | CPC: |
F15B15/082 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1992/51] |
Former [1992/43] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Druckmittelzylinder | [1992/43] | English: | Pressure fluid actuator | [1992/43] | French: | Vérin à fluide sous pression | [1992/43] | Examination procedure | 22.04.1992 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.07.1992 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, GR, LI, LU, SE | 22.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/51] | 27.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 28.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 01.09.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.05.1992 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.1992 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.1992 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.1992 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.1992 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.1992 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.1992 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.1992 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0260344 (PROMA PROD & MARKETING GMBH [DE]); | [X]GB2163499 (HERION WERKE KG); | [A]EP0147803 (TOL O MATIC INC [US]) |