EP0455072 - Silver chloride reference electrode [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.1996 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.08.1996 [1996/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pacesetter AB Röntgenvägen 2 171 95 Solna / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/04] | For all designated states Pacesetter AB Röntgenvägen 2 S-171 95 Solna / SE | ||
Former [1991/45] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Preidel, Walter, Dr. Eskilstunastrasse 14 W-8520 Erlangen / DE | [1991/45] | Representative(s) | Lettström, Richard Wilhelm Albihns Stockholm AB, Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/04] | Lettström, Richard Wilhelm H. Albihns Patentbyra AB, Box 3137 S-103 62 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 91106335.2 | 19.04.1991 | [1991/45] | Priority number, date | DE19904014112 | 02.05.1990 Original published format: DE 4014112 | [1991/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0455072 | Date: | 06.11.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0455072 | Date: | 30.08.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/05, // G01N27/30 | [1991/45] | CPC: |
A61N1/056 (EP,US);
A61N1/36557 (EP,US);
G01N27/301 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49117 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1991/45] | Title | German: | Silberchlorid-Bezugselektrode | [1991/45] | English: | Silver chloride reference electrode | [1991/45] | French: | Electrode de référence au chlorure d'argent | [1991/45] | Examination procedure | 05.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/28] | 28.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 24.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 01.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8201306 (SMITH & NEPHEW ASS [GB], et al); | [Y]US4589418 (GOPIKANTH MYSORE L [US]); | [Y]EP0170509 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]); | [Y]GB2215844 (CAMBRIDGE LIFE SCIENCES [GB]); | [A]FR2378529 (UNIV CASE WESTERN RESERVE [US]); | [AP]EP0393188 (TERUMO CORP [JP]) | [A] - JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY Band 134, Nr. 1, Januar 1987, Seiten 132-134, Manchester, NH, US; W.R. CIESLAK et al.: "The Fabrication and Performance of a Ag/AgCl Reference Electrode in Thionyl Chloride Electrolyte" |