EP0456025 - High voltage circuit interrupter with arc in series [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2003 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): NL | published on 12.03.2003 [2003/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEC ALSTHOM SA 38, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/46] | For all designated states GEC ALSTHOM SA 38, avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dufournet, Denis 26E, rue de la Vieguerse F-69500 Bron / FR | 02 /
Perret, Michel 10 Résidence de l'Agny, Tramole F-38300 Bourgoin-Jallieu / FR | [1991/46] | Representative(s) | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Spott, Weinmiller & Böhm Patentanwälte Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/46] | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Lennéstrasse 9 Postfach 24 D-82336 Feldafing / DE | Application number, filing date | 91106454.1 | 22.04.1991 | [1991/46] | Priority number, date | FR19900005326 | 26.04.1990 Original published format: FR 9005326 | [1991/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0456025 | Date: | 13.11.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0456025 | Date: | 01.03.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01H33/90, H01H33/95 | [1991/46] | CPC: |
H01H33/903 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/46] | Title | German: | Hochspannungsschalter mit Hilfslichtbogen in Reihe | [1991/46] | English: | High voltage circuit interrupter with arc in series | [1991/46] | French: | Disjoncteur à haute tension à arc série | [1991/46] | Examination procedure | 18.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/08] | 25.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 01.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 01.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 01.03.1995 | GB | 01.03.1995 | GR | 01.03.1995 | NL | 01.03.1995 | BE | 30.04.1995 | LU | 30.04.1995 | [2003/11] |
Former [2000/27] | DK | 01.03.1995 | |
GB | 01.03.1995 | ||
GR | 01.03.1995 | ||
BE | 30.04.1995 | ||
LU | 30.04.1995 | ||
NL | 30.04.1995 | ||
Former [2000/05] | DK | 01.03.1995 | |
GB | 01.03.1995 | ||
GR | 01.03.1995 | ||
BE | 30.04.1995 | ||
LU | 30.04.1995 | ||
Former [1998/15] | DK | 01.03.1995 | |
GB | 01.03.1995 | ||
BE | 30.04.1995 | ||
Former [1996/22] | GB | 01.03.1995 | |
BE | 30.04.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | GB | 01.03.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2349263 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE); | [AD]FR2610763 (ALSTHOM [FR]); | [A]EP0302390 (ALSTHOM [FR]); | [A]EP0334181 (ALSTHOM [FR]) |