EP0457064 - Method for driving a mobile system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.10.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.1994 | Refusal of application | published on 14.12.1994 [1994/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/47] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schröder, Martin, Dr. Anna-Hermann-Strasse 12B W-8522 Herzogenaurach / DE | 02 /
Gose, Horst, Dipl.-Ing. Romesstrasse 8b W-8520 Erlangen / DE | 03 /
Jantzer, Michael, Dipl.-Ing. Marienbacherstrasse 36 W-7000 Stuttgart 50 / DE | 04 /
Heller, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. Stellaweg 15 W-7000 Stuttgart 80 / DE | 05 /
Schumacher, Hans, Dipl.-Inform. Gutbrodstrasse 83 W-7000 Stuttgart / DE | [1991/47] | Application number, filing date | 91106529.0 | 23.04.1991 | [1991/47] | Priority number, date | EP19900109059 | 14.05.1990 Original published format: EP 90109059 | [1991/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0457064 | Date: | 21.11.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/02, G05D1/03 | [1991/47] | CPC: |
G05D1/0234 (EP);
G05D1/0236 (EP);
G05D1/0255 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/47] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Steuerung mobiler Systeme | [1991/47] | English: | Method for driving a mobile system | [1991/47] | French: | Procédé pour piloter un système mobile | [1991/47] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 06.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/05] | 09.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.07.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1994/50] | 31.07.1994 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1994/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1994 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE3315051 (KOETTGEN GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [A]WO8505474 (GEN ELECTRIC CO PLC [GB]); | [A]WO8604430 (GEN ELECTRIC CO PLC [GB]); | [A]EP0193985 (IND CONTRACTORS HOLLAND BV [NL]); | [A]EP0236614 (SI HANDLING SYSTEMS [US]); | [A]DE3912353 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) |