EP0456049 - Process for the preparation of vinylphosphonic acid derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.02.1996 [1996/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/46] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Northemann, Andreas, Dr. Rheinfeldstrasse 24 W-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
Fischer, Martin, Dr. Elbinger Weg 1 W-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
Wambach, Ludwig, Dr. Gabelsbergerstrasse 2 W-6900 Heidelberg / DE | [1991/46] | Application number, filing date | 91106750.2 | 26.04.1991 | [1991/46] | Priority number, date | DE19904014483 | 07.05.1990 Original published format: DE 4014483 | [1991/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0456049 | Date: | 13.11.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0456049 | Date: | 15.02.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/40, C07F9/38 | [1991/46] | CPC: |
C07F9/4015 (EP,US);
C07F9/3826 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1991/46] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Vinylphosphonsäurederivaten | [1991/46] | English: | Process for the preparation of vinylphosphonic acid derivatives | [1991/46] | French: | Procédé de préparation de dérivés d'acide vinylphosphonique | [1991/46] | Examination procedure | 20.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/46] | 26.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 28.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 03.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1900858 (STAUFFER CHEMICAL CO); | [A]EP0032663 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [A]US3064030 (CHADWICK DAVID H, et al) |