EP0463320 - Holder for magnetic tape cassettes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - applicant | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states fischerwerke Artur Fischer GmbH & Co. KG Weinhalde 14-18 72178 Waldachtal / DE | [2009/50] |
Former [1992/01] | For all designated states fischerwerke Artur Fischer GmbH & Co. KG Weinhalde 14 - 18 D-72178 Waldachtal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heizmann, Hans Peter Frühlingsstrasse 10 W-7298 Lossburg/Lombach / DE | 02 /
Kaupp, Eduard Im Bürgle 7 W-7244 Waldachtal/Tumlingen / DE | 03 /
Nehl, Wolfgang Im Martinskirchle W-7244 Waldachtal/Tumlingen / DE | 04 /
Rothfuss, Hartmut Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 19 W-7244 Waldachtal/Tumlingen / DE | 05 /
Weber, Wilfried Am Stücklesberg 10 W-7294 Schopfloch / DE | [1992/01] | Application number, filing date | 91106894.8 | 27.04.1991 | [1992/01] | Priority number, date | DE19904020163 | 25.06.1990 Original published format: DE 4020163 | [1992/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0463320 | Date: | 02.01.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0463320 | Date: | 05.08.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0463320 | Date: | 05.07.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G11B23/023 | [1992/01] | CPC: |
G11B23/0236 (EP,US);
G11B33/04 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/01] | Title | German: | Behälter für Magnetbandkassetten | [1992/01] | English: | Holder for magnetic tape cassettes | [1992/01] | French: | Récipient pour cassettes à bande magnétique | [1992/01] | Examination procedure | 04.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/05] | 09.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1170729 (PHILIPS ELECTRONIC ASSOCIATED [GB]); | [A]US3603478 (CONNAN ANDREW S); | [A]US3677396 (STAAR THEOPHIEL CLEMENT JOSEF); | [A]DE2542622 (GRANLUND HAKON); | [A]GB2185878 (IDN INVENTION DEV NOVELTIES); | [A]WO8706210 (SEGAWA TOMOFUMI); | [A]EP0290717 (IDN INVENTION DEV NOVELTIES [CH]) |