EP0456087 - Device for assembling a flat product consisting of several overlays [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.1994 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.06.1994 [1994/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states G.M. PFAFF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Königstrasse 154 67655 Kaiserslautern / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/46] | For all designated states G.M. PFAFF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Königstrasse 154 D-67655 Kaiserslautern / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dietrich, Herbert Schützenstrasse 59 W-6750 Kaiserslautern / DE | 02 /
Mall, Günther Spinozastrasse 7 W-6750 Kaiserslautern / DE | [1991/46] | Representative(s) | Klein, Friedrich Auf der Pirsch 11 67663 Kaiserslautern / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/46] | Klein, Friedrich Auf der Pirsch 11 D-67663 Kaiserslautern / DE | Application number, filing date | 91106982.1 | 30.04.1991 | [1991/46] | Priority number, date | DE19904014797 | 09.05.1990 Original published format: DE 4014797 | [1991/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0456087 | Date: | 13.11.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0456087 | Date: | 13.01.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A43D11/00, A43D25/18 | [1991/46] | CPC: |
A43D11/00 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1702 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1744 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1751 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1991/46] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Zusammenfügen eines flächenhaften Verbundwerkstückes | [1991/46] | English: | Device for assembling a flat product consisting of several overlays | [1991/46] | French: | Dispositif pour assembler un produit plat composé de plusieurs parties superposées | [1991/46] | File destroyed: | 31.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 14.07.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/24] | 15.12.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1994/24] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1993 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3418309 (PIETSCH INGO); | [A]US3399410 (MACKENZIE FRED T, et al); | [A]FR2340813 (USM CORP [US]) |