EP0455218 - Method and apparatus for measuring a phase-modulated signal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.1995 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 17.01.1996 [1996/03] | Applicant(s) | For:CH
DE
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
Firma Carl Zeiss D-73446 Oberkochen / DE | For:GB
CARL ZEISS-STIFTUNG HANDELND ALS CARL ZEISS D-89518 Heidenheim (Brenz) / DE | [1991/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Küchel, Michael, Dr. Keplerstrasse 3 W-7082 Oberkochen / DE | [1991/45] | Application number, filing date | 91107011.8 | 30.04.1991 | [1991/45] | Priority number, date | DE19904014019 | 02.05.1990 Original published format: DE 4014019 | [1991/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0455218 | Date: | 06.11.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0455218 | Date: | 11.01.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01J9/02 | [1991/45] | CPC: |
G01J9/02 (EP,US);
G01B11/2441 (EP,US);
G01B11/25 (EP,US);
G01B9/02032 (EP,US);
G01B9/02081 (EP,US);
G06T7/521 (EP,US);
G01J2009/0249 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/45] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Messung eines phasenmodulierten Signals | [1991/45] | English: | Method and apparatus for measuring a phase-modulated signal | [1991/45] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour le mesurage d'un signal modulé en phase | [1991/45] | Examination procedure | 10.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/11] | 28.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 01.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 11.04.1995 | [1996/03] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DD262080 (AKAD WISSENSCHAFTEN DDR [DD]); | [A]DE3707331 (ZEISS CARL FA [DE]); | [AD]US4744659 (KITABAYASHI JUNICHI [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, unexamined applications, P field, Band 12, Nr. 284, 4. August 1988 THE PATENT OFFICE JAPANESE GOVERNMENT Seite 67 P 740 | [AD] - OPTICAL ENGINEERING, Band 23, Nr. 4, Juli/August 1984 K.H. WOMACK "Interferametric phase measurement using spatial synchronous de- tection" Seiten 391-395 | [AD] - APPLIED OPTICS, Band 22, Nr. 21, November 1983 J. SCHWIDER et al. "Digital wave-front measu- ring interferametry: same systematic error sources" Seiten 3421-3432 | Examination | - PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, vol. 680, Katherine Creath: "Comparison of Phase Measurement Algorithms", USA, 1986 | - APPLIED OPTICS, vol. 24, no. 18, Y. Cheng et al.: "Phase shifter calibration in phase-shifting interferometry", 15.09.1985, Seiten 3049-3052 | - PROGRESS IN OPTICS, vol. XXVI, ed.: E. Wolf; Katherine Creath: "Phase-Measurement Interferometry Techniques", Elsevier Science Publishers B.V., Amsterdam, Oxford, New York, Tokyo, 1988 |