EP0455260 - Support element for grass surfacings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.1994 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ritter, Frank Georg Schwibbogenmauer 18 86150 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/45] | For all designated states Ritter, Frank Georg Schwibbogenmauer 18 D-86150 Augsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Prestele, Eugen Albert-Greiner-Strasse 73 W-8900 Augsburg / DE | [1991/45] | Representative(s) | Gallo, Wolfgang, et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Buchenweg 17 86573 Obergriesbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Gallo, Wolfgang, et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Ludwigstrasse 26 86152 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [1991/45] | Gallo, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. (FH), et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. L. Fleuchaus, Dipl.-Phys. H. Schroeter, Dipl.-Ing K. Lehmann, Dipl.-Ing.W. Wehser, Dipl.-Ing.(FH) W. Gallo, Ludwigstrasse 26 D-86152 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 91107223.9 | 03.05.1991 | [1991/45] | Priority number, date | DE19900005078U | 04.05.1990 Original published format: DE 9005078 U | [1991/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0455260 | Date: | 06.11.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0455260 | Date: | 21.04.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | E01C9/00, E01C13/00 | [1991/45] | CPC: |
E01C9/004 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/45] | Title | German: | Rasenbefestigungsplatte | [1991/45] | English: | Support element for grass surfacings | [1991/45] | French: | Elément de support pour surfaces de gazon | [1991/45] | Examination procedure | 19.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/16] | 21.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US4111585 (MASCARO THOMAS C); | [Y]DE8622303U ; | [Y]US4621942 (HILL RONALD F [US]) |